321A Barbey St
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Alan S Trust |
Case #: | 8:24-bk-71312 |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 06, 2024 |
Debtor
321A Barbey St
50 Carolina Ave
Hempstead, NY 11550-7206 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Andrew M Thaler
Andrew M. Thaler, Trustee c/o Cullen and Dykman LLP The Omni 333 Earle Ovington Blvd., 2nd Fl
Uniondale, NY 11553 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722 |
Docket last updated: 04/04/2024 12:05 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
court
Related Cases
Thu 04/04 11:38 AM
The above case is related to Case Number(s) 17-75400 ast Dismissed: 2/5/2018; 16-72216 ast Terminated: 2/24/2017; 16-76006 ast Dismissed: 5/5/2017 18-72613 ast dismissed 9/19/2018; 8 19-73721 ast dismssed 11/6/2019, Victor Inwang (hrm) |
||
utility
~Force Judge Assignment
Thu 04/04 11:39 AM
Judge Assigned Due to Related Case, Judge Reassigned. (hrm) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Thu 04/04 11:37 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non Individuals. Fee Amount $ 338 Filed by 321A Barbey St (hrm) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Judge - Trustee - 341 Meeting Assignment (Chapter 7 Business No Asset) (Auto Assign)
Thu 04/04 11:39 AM
Notice of Chapter 7 Business Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee, Thaler, Andrew M, with 341(a) Meeting to be held on 5/6/2024 at 10:00 AM at Zoom.us/join - Thaler: Meeting ID 323 749 7231, Passcode 7097987914, Phone 1 (516) |
|
4 | 4
court
Deficient Filing Chapter 7
Thu 04/04 11:42 AM
Deficient Filing Chapter 7: Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 4/4/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 4/4/2024. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 4/4/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 4/18/2024. Schedule A/B due 4/18/2024. Schedule D due 4/18/2024. Schedule E/F due 4/18/2024. Schedule G due 4/18/2024. Schedule H due 4/18/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 4/18/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 4/18/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 4/18/2024. (hrm) |