Lisi v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Edgardo Ramos |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02561 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Supreme Court of New York, New York County, 151628/2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 04, 2024 12:13 PM EDT |
Defendant
Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Lisi
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 04/15 9:16 AM
STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, CONSENTED TO AND AGREED, by and between counsel for the Defendant, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company ("Nationwide"), and counsel for Plaintiff, Robert Lisi ("Plaintiff") that the time within which Nationwide may serve and file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended to April 25, 2024. Nationwide also waives any defense as to service of the Complaint. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company answer due 4/25/2024., Motions terminated:4 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Tracey K. Wishert dated April 12, 2024. filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/12/2024) (rro) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 04/12 5:42 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Tracey K. Wishert dated April 12, 2024. Document filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company..(Wishert, Tracey) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Fri 04/05 10:24 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Tracey Kohl Wishert. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code p (Plaintiff); Dollar Demand $400,000,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to d (Defendant); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $400,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 04/05 10:25 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 04/05 10:27 AM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/05 10:27 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/04 12:07 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Theodore Alfred Mottola on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company..(Mottola, Theodore) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/04 11:18 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wishert, Tracey) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 04/04 11:18 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 151628/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29173965).Document filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company..(Wishert, Tracey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B |