Boehm et al v. Boucher et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Ronnie Abrams |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02562 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 04, 2024 12:13 PM EDT |
Defendant
Brian Albert Boucher
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 1
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 10
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 11
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 2
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 3
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 4
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 5
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 6
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 7
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 8
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 9
|
|
Plaintiff
Scott Boehm
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Spinelli
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Stluka
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Fri 04/19 2:32 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Brian Albert Boucher served on 4/13/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. Service was accepted by Brian Boucher. Document filed by David Stluka; Paul Spinelli; Scott Boehm..(Kleinman, Nathaniel) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Tue 04/09 5:32 PM
ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial status conference on June 7, 2024 at 2:30 p.m. If Defendants have been properly served and the parties are available to proceed with an initial status conference prior to June 7, 2024, the parties shall notify the Court and propose an earlier date for the conference. If Defendants have not yet been properly served, have not filed a responsive pleading, and/or the parties otherwise seek to adjourn the conference, they shall notify the Court by no later than May 31, 2024. Unless the parties request otherwise, the Court will hold this conference by telephone. The parties shall use the following dial-in information to call in to the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public. Initial Conference set for 6/7/2024 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/9/2024) (ate) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted
Fri 04/05 10:48 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(jgo) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/05 10:48 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brian Albert Boucher..(jgo) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 04/05 10:45 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 04/05 10:47 AM
Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/05 10:47 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/04 1:32 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Patrick McCulloch on behalf of Scott Boehm, Paul Spinelli, David Stluka..(McCulloch, Kevin) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/04 1:11 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brian Albert Boucher d/b/a Fotovinting, re:1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Scott Boehm, Paul Spinelli, David Stluka..(Kleinman, Nathaniel) |
|
3 | 3
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney
Thu 04/04 12:29 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Kleinman, Nathaniel) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/04 11:51 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kleinman, Nathaniel) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/04 11:36 AM
COMPLAINT against Brian Albert Boucher, John Doe 1, John Doe 10, John Doe 11, John Doe 2, John Doe 3, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 6, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29174080)Document filed by David Stluka, Paul Spinelli, Scott Boehm..(Kleinman, Nathaniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Fotovinting Chart, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Plaquelady Chart, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - AutographsandMore Chart, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Autographsmadeasy Chart, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Coast to Coast Collectibles Chart, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - EuropeTraveller Chart, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Joycestreasures2008 Chart, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Misterinksignatures Chart, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Showman Collectibles Chart, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Sportsactionshots Chart, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - SportsAveNY Chart |