The Morning Jump, LLC
North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David M Warren |
Case #: | 5:24-bk-01113 |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 02, 2024 |
Claims Deadline: | Jul 31, 2024 |
Discharge Objection Deadline: | Jul 01, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
The Morning Jump, LLC
106 S Bragg Blvd
Spring Lake, NC 28390-3927 |
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
48 | 48
claims
Notice of Disputed/Contingent/Unliquidated Claim
Wed 05/01 2:28 PM
Notice of Disputed, Contingent and/or Unliquidated Claim(s) filed by Kathleen O'Malley on behalf of The Morning Jump, LLC.(O'Malley, Kathleen) |
|
47 | 47
claims
Notice of Disputed/Contingent/Unliquidated Claim
Wed 05/01 2:25 PM
Notice of Disputed, Contingent and/or Unliquidated Claim(s) filed by Kathleen O'Malley on behalf of The Morning Jump, LLC.(O'Malley, Kathleen) |
|
46 | 46
claims
Notice of Disputed/Contingent/Unliquidated Claim
Wed 05/01 2:23 PM
Notice of Disputed, Contingent and/or Unliquidated Claim(s) filed by Kathleen O'Malley on behalf of The Morning Jump, LLC.(O'Malley, Kathleen) |
|
45 | 45
claims
Notice of Disputed/Contingent/Unliquidated Claim
Wed 05/01 2:18 PM
Notice of Disputed, Contingent and/or Unliquidated Claim(s) filed by Kathleen O'Malley on behalf of The Morning Jump, LLC.(O'Malley, Kathleen) |
|
44 | 44
claims
Notice of Disputed/Contingent/Unliquidated Claim
Wed 05/01 2:16 PM
Notice of Disputed, Contingent and/or Unliquidated Claim(s) filed by Kathleen O'Malley on behalf of The Morning Jump, LLC.(O'Malley, Kathleen) |
|
43 | 43
claims
Notice of Disputed/Contingent/Unliquidated Claim
Wed 05/01 2:13 PM
Notice of Disputed, Contingent and/or Unliquidated Claim(s) filed by Kathleen O'Malley on behalf of The Morning Jump, LLC.(O'Malley, Kathleen) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
42 | 42
order
Approve Officer Compensation
Tue 04/30 10:32 AM
Order Granting Application for Approval of Officer Compensation (parker, roxanne) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Sat 04/27 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 04/26/2024. (Admin.) |
|
40 | 40
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order
Sat 04/27 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 04/26/2024. (Admin.) |
|
39 | 39
misc
Notice of Motion
Fri 04/26 1:48 PM
Notice of Motion filed by Brian D. Darer on behalf of PNC Bank, National Association . (Darer, Brian) |
|
38 | 38
motion
Relief from Stay
Fri 04/26 1:47 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay (Fee 199) (Fee Paid) filed by Brian D. Darer on behalf of PNC Bank, National Association (Darer, Brian) |
|
37 | 37
order
Employ
Fri 04/26 11:57 AM
Order Granting Application to Employ (parker, roxanne) |
|
crditcrd
none (ADI)
Fri 04/26 2:08 PM
Receipt Of Filing Fee For Motion for Relief from Stay([LINK 24-01113 5-DMW] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00), Receipt Number A17853220, Amount $ 199.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 04/25 11:10 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Kathleen O'Malley on behalf of The Morning Jump, LLC . (O'Malley, Kathleen) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
order
Appear for Examination
Wed 04/24 1:44 PM
Order to Appear for Examination (Erik Todd Brinkman) . (parker, roxanne) |
|
34 | 34
order
Continue Meeting of Creditors
Wed 04/24 1:43 PM
Order Granting Motion to Continue Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/29/2024 at 10:00 AM at Greenville 341 Meeting Room. Certificate of Service due 4/29/2024. (parker, roxanne) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Continue Meeting of Creditors
Tue 04/23 4:49 PM
Motion to Continue Meeting of Creditors filed by Kathleen O'Malley on behalf of The Morning Jump, LLC (O'Malley, Kathleen) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
badmin
Recommendation re: Motion (No Objection - BA)
Mon 04/22 10:11 AM
Recommendation Regarding Motion (No Objection) [KBB] filed by Kylie Beresford on behalf of Bankruptcy Administrator . (Beresford, Kylie) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
badmin
Recommendation re: Motion (No Objection - BA)
Thu 04/18 10:44 AM
Recommendation Regarding Motion (No Objection) [KBB] filed by Kylie Beresford on behalf of Bankruptcy Administrator . (Beresford, Kylie) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
amdsch
Schedules and Statements
Wed 04/17 3:50 PM
Schedules and Statements - - / Fee Not Required filed by Kathleen O'Malley on behalf of The Morning Jump, LLC. (O'Malley, Kathleen) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
order
Waive 4002-1 Requirement
Tue 04/16 11:01 AM
Order Granting Motion to Waive 4002-1 Requirement (parker, roxanne) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
badmin
Intake Notice Sent
Fri 04/12 1:13 PM
The Intake Notice has been sent by the Bankruptcy Administrator filed by Kylie Beresford on behalf of Bankruptcy Administrator. (Beresford, Kylie) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order
Thu 04/11 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 04/10/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Waive Local Rule 4002-1 Requirement
Tue 04/09 3:29 PM
Motion to Waive Local Rule 4002-1 Requirement filed by Kathleen O'Malley on behalf of The Morning Jump, LLC (O'Malley, Kathleen) |
|
28 | 28
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 04/09 10:53 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Kathleen O'Malley on behalf of The Morning Jump, LLC . (O'Malley, Kathleen) |
|
utility
Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar
Tue 04/09 11:08 AM
Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar - 5/7/24 (Donleycott, Sarah) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
order
Interim Order
Mon 04/08 1:23 PM
Interim Order Hearing scheduled for 5/7/2024 at 10:30 AM at Raleigh Courtroom (3rd Floor) . (parker, roxanne) |
|
26 | 26
order
Pay Pre-Petition Wages
Mon 04/08 12:44 PM
Order Granting Motion to Pay Pre-Petition Wages (parker, roxanne) |
|
25 | 25
order
Regarding Status Conference
Mon 04/08 12:16 PM
Order Regarding Status Conference . (Donleycott, Sarah) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Approval of Officer Compensation (Ch. 11)
Mon 04/08 12:05 PM
Application for Approval of Officer Compensation (Danae Brinkman, Katelyn Bartlett, Tyson Leavitt as Employees) Recommendation due 4/22/2024 filed by Kathleen O'Malley on behalf of The Morning Jump, LLC (O'Malley, Kathleen) |
|
23 | 23
audio
Mon 04/08 11:20 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [04/08/2024 10:05:29 AM]. File Size [ 19464 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:41:31 ]. (11A Status Conference). (admin) |
|
Sunday, April 07, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order
Mon 04/08 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 04/07/2024. (Admin.) |
|
21 | 21
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order
Mon 04/08 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 04/07/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Saturday, April 06, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order
Sun 04/07 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 04/06/2024. (Admin.) |
|
19 | 19
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Sun 04/07 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 04/06/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Mailing Matrix
Fri 04/05 4:20 PM
Amended/Amendment to Creditor Mailing Matrix - (Fee Required) - Creditor or Creditors Added / Fee Required filed by Kathleen O'Malley on behalf of The Morning Jump, LLC. (O'Malley, Kathleen) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Attorney Statement of Compensation
Fri 04/05 11:49 AM
Attorney Statement of Compensation filed by William P Janvier on behalf of The Morning Jump, LLC. (Janvier, William) |
|
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
File Plan & D/S & Setting Status Conf. (11A)
Fri 04/05 8:42 AM
Order to File Plan and Disclosure Statement and Notice of Status Conference Chapter 11 Plan due by 7/3/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 7/3/2024. Status hearing to be held on 4/8/2024 at 10:00 AM at Raleigh Courtroom (3rd Floor). . (Donleycott, Sarah) |
|
15 | 15
order
Regarding Administration of Estate (Ch. 11)
Fri 04/05 7:00 AM
Order Regarding Administration of Estate. (adi) |
|
crditcrd
none (ADI)
Fri 04/05 4:21 PM
Receipt Of Filing Fee For Creditor Mailing Matrix([LINK 24-01113 5-DMW] ) [misc,crdisk] ( 34.00), Receipt Number A17818667, Amount $ 34.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
7
pgs
motion
Employ
Thu 04/04 4:04 PM
Application to Employ William P. Janvier and Stevens Martin Vaughn & Tadych, PLLC as Attorney for Debtor Recommendation due 4/18/2024 filed by William P Janvier on behalf of The Morning Jump, LLC (Janvier, William) |
|
13 | 13
utility
Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar
Thu 04/04 2:58 PM
Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar - 4/8/24 (Gibson, Aileen) |
|
12 | 12
utility
Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar
Thu 04/04 2:57 PM
Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar - 4/8/24 (Gibson, Aileen) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Notice of Motion
Thu 04/04 1:43 PM
Notice of Motion filed by Kathleen O'Malley on behalf of The Morning Jump, LLC . (O'Malley, Kathleen) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Pay Pre-Petition Wages
Thu 04/04 1:32 PM
Emergency Motion to Pay Pre-Petition Wages filed by Kathleen O'Malley on behalf of The Morning Jump, LLC (O'Malley, Kathleen) |
|
9 | 9
court
Corrected PDF Attachment
Thu 04/04 1:28 PM
Corrected PDF Attachment filed by William P Janvier on behalf of The Morning Jump, LLC . (Janvier, William) **Corrective Entry: Entered in error. Please disregard.** Modified on 4/4/2024 (Wright, Dawn) |
|
8 | 8
utility
Calendar - Schedule
Thu 04/04 1:02 PM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Schedule Hearing Date 11(a) status conference (parker, roxanne) |
|
7 | 7
order
Appear for Examination
Thu 04/04 1:00 PM
Order to Appear for Examination (Erik Todd Brinkman) . (parker, roxanne) |
|
6 | 6
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corp.)
Thu 04/04 12:58 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/2/2024 at 10:00 AM at Greenville 341 Meeting Room. Last day to file complaint is 7/1/2024. Proofs of Claims due by 7/31/2024. (parker, roxanne) |
|
5 | 5
court
Deficiency Notice - Petitions (BNC)
Thu 04/04 12:56 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to William Janvier re: Petition. In order for this case to be administered, it is necessary that the following item(s) be filed by the date(s) indicated: Schedule A/B. Schedule D. Schedule E/F. Schedule G. Schedule H. Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules. Statement of Affairs. Statement of Current Monthly Income - Ch. 11. Attorney Disclosure of Compensation. Summary of Schedules. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 1008, all petitions, lists, schedules, statements, and amendments should be verified or contain an unsworn declaration as provided in 28 U.S.C. 1746. The three day mailing period as provided for under Rule 9006(f), Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, does not apply. Incomplete Filings due by 4/18/2024. Disclosure of Compensation due by 4/18/2024. Summary of Schedules due by 4/18/2024. (parker, roxanne) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Cash Collateral
Thu 04/04 12:21 PM
Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Kathleen O'Malley on behalf of The Morning Jump, LLC (O'Malley, Kathleen) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Resolution
Thu 04/04 11:25 AM
Corporate Resolution filed by William P Janvier on behalf of The Morning Jump, LLC. (Janvier, William) |
|
2 | 2
court
Request re: Debtor Electronic Notice
Thu 04/04 10:42 AM
Request to Activate Debtor Electronic Notice filed by William P Janvier on behalf of The Morning Jump, LLC. (Janvier, William) |
|
1 | 1
15
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) AA
Thu 04/04 10:41 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition filed by The Morning Jump, LLC (Janvier, William) |
|
crditcrd
none (ADI)
Thu 04/04 11:00 AM
Receipt Of Filing Fee For Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-01113 5] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00), Receipt Number A17814952, Amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
utility
Note - CA Assignment (Public)
Thu 04/04 10:51 AM
NOTE: Case manager assigned to case is Roxanne Parker (Wright, Dawn) |
||
utility
Note - DEBN Account
Thu 04/04 11:00 AM
NOTE: DEBN Account(s) Activated (Felder-Campbell, Jade) |
||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 04/04 2:52 PM
Notice of Hearing Hearing scheduled for 4/8/2024 at 10:00 AM at Raleigh Courtroom (3rd Floor) filed by Kathleen O'Malley on behalf of The Morning Jump, LLC . (Gibson, Aileen) |
||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 04/04 2:56 PM
Notice of Hearing Hearing scheduled for 4/8/2024 at 10:00 AM at Raleigh Courtroom (3rd Floor) filed by Kathleen O'Malley on behalf of The Morning Jump, LLC . (Gibson, Aileen) |