Western Energy Opportunities II, LLC d/b/a Western Energy Regional Center v. Finalis Securities, LLC et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Edgardo Ramos |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02565 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1964 Civil Remedies: Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 04, 2024 1:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
ABC Corporations 1 Through 10
|
|
Defendant
Rupy Cheema
|
|
Defendant
EB5 Energy Fund I, LP d/b/a EB5 Marketplace
|
|
Defendant
EB5 Energy Holdings, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Finalis Securities, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Kurt Edward Reuss
|
|
Plaintiff
Western Energy Opportunities II, LLC d/b/a Western Energy Regional Center
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/08 2:35 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rupy Cheema..(jgo) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/08 2:35 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kurt Edward Reuss..(jgo) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/08 2:34 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Finalis Securities, LLC..(jgo) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/08 2:33 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to EB5 Energy Holdings, LLC..(jgo) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/08 2:32 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to EB5 Energy Fund I, LP d/b/a EB5 Marketplace..(jgo) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/05 2:13 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rupy Cheema, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Western Energy Opportunities II, LLC..(Kehrli, Kevin) |
|
8 | 8
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/05 2:12 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to EB5 Energy Fund I, LP d/b/a EB5 Marketplace, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Western Energy Opportunities II, LLC..(Kehrli, Kevin) |
|
7 | 7
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/05 2:11 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to EB5 Energy Holdings, LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Western Energy Opportunities II, LLC..(Kehrli, Kevin) |
|
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/05 2:10 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Finalis Securities, LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Western Energy Opportunities II, LLC..(Kehrli, Kevin) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/05 2:08 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kurt Edward Reuss, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Western Energy Opportunities II, LLC..(Kehrli, Kevin) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Fri 04/05 11:46 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kevin Kehrli. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $75,000,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 04/05 11:49 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 04/05 11:51 AM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/05 11:51 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/04 4:02 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Western Energy Opportunities II, LLC d/b/a Western Energy Regional Center..(Kehrli, Kevin) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/04 12:32 PM
FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Western Energy Opportunities II, LLC d/b/a Western Energy Regional Center..(Kehrli, Kevin) Modified on 4/4/2024 (lb) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/04 12:28 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kehrli, Kevin) |
|
1 | 1
25
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/04 12:28 PM
COMPLAINT against ABC Corporations 1 Through 10, Rupy Cheema, EB5 Energy Fund I, LP d/b/a EB5 Marketplace, EB5 Energy Holdings, LLC, Finalis Securities, LLC, Kurt Edward Reuss. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29174594)Document filed by Western Energy Opportunities II, LLC d/b/a Western Energy Regional Center..(Kehrli, Kevin) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/04 1:01 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Kevin Kehrli to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the corporate disclosure statement is not correct;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb) |