Girotto v. The Old Yew Plant Shop, LLC et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Arun Subramanian |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02568 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 04, 2024 1:13 PM EDT |
Defendant
Horatio Street LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Old Yew Plant Shop, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Luigi Girotto
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
3
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Fri 04/05 5:10 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/8/2024 at 12:30 PM before Judge Arun Subramanian. The conference will be held by phone. The parties should dial in by calling (646) 453-4442 and entering the Phone Conference ID: 619 724 184, followed by the pound (#) sign. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 4/5/2024) (vfr) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/05 12:37 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Old Yew Plant Shop, LLC..(jgo) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/05 12:36 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Horatio Street LLC..(jgo) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 04/05 12:34 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Arun Subramanian. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 04/05 12:35 PM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/05 12:35 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/04 12:54 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HORATIO STREET LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Luigi Girotto..(Weitz, Ben-Zion) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/04 12:53 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE OLD YEW PLANT SHOP, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Luigi Girotto..(Weitz, Ben-Zion) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/04 12:51 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weitz, Ben-Zion) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/04 12:50 PM
COMPLAINT against Horatio Street LLC, The Old Yew Plant Shop, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29174763)Document filed by Luigi Girotto..(Weitz, Ben-Zion) |