Crabtree v. Walmart Inc.
Kentucky Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert E Wier |
Referred: | Hanly A Ingram |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00048 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Wayne Circuit Court, 23-CI-283 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 04, 2024 2:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Crabtree
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order Deadline
Wed 04/24 10:31 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. Parties shall exchange initial Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by 5/1/2024. 2. Parties shall have until 10/31/2024 to join add'l parties and amend pleadings. 3. Fact discovery by 2/14/20-25. Expert discovery by 4/11/2025. 4. Plas to disclose expert witnesses who may be used at trial by 12/31/2024. Defs by 3/7/2025. 5. Dispositive motions by 3/17/2025. 6. TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE set for 9/20/2024 at 11:00 AM in LONDON before Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram. The call will be off the record and for counsel only. 7. Per District Judge Wier's referral order (D.E. 3), the Court declines at this time to schedule a pretrial conference, trial, or deadlines for related filings. Upon resolution of any summary judgment motion or expiration of deadlines for same, Judge Wier will, as necessary and appropriate, set other deadlines/proceedings. 8. Modification of this schedule will only occur under standards of Rule 16 and/or Rule 6. 9. Other than the agreed-upon discovery limits within the parties' Rule 26(f) report, the default limits within the discovery rules apply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 4/24/2024.(KJA) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
utility
File Submitted
Tue 04/23 9:24 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Hanly A. Ingram for review:7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (MM) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Mon 04/22 12:32 PM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Waldrop, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/10 11:03 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Francesco Waldrop on behalf of Walmart Inc. (Waldrop, Joshua) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order For Meeting and Report
Thu 04/04 3:51 PM
ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: (1) Within 21 days, the parties, by counsel, shall meet, either in person or by telephone, to consider the topics Rule 26(f)(2) mandates.(2) Within 14 days of the meeting, the parties shall file a joint status report containing: See Order for a. - e; (3) If the parties propose a deadline for dispositive motions to be filed that is more than one (1) year from the date the joint status report required by paragraph (2) is filed, they SHALL specifically describe the basis for the length of their proposed schedule with sufficient detail for the Court to assess that schedule and its progression, including in particular the discovery and dispositive motions deadlines.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 4/4/2024.(MM) |
|
Att: 1 MJ Consent | ||
3 | 3
order
REW Standing Case Management and Referral Order
Thu 04/04 1:32 PM
STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier. (MM) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1
Thu 04/04 1:26 PM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart Inc.. (MM) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 04/04 1:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Wayne Circuit Court, case number 23-CI-00283. ( Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-5808066), filed by Walmart Inc..(MM) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Discovery Responses, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State Court Record, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/04 1:28 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Walmart Inc. - Filed in State Court Record See1 (MM) |
||
misc
Conflict Check
Thu 04/04 1:33 PM
Conflict Check run. (MM) |