CSC Sugar LLC v. M/V ST. PAUL, IMO: 9623051 et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Julie Rebecca Rubin |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00984 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 28:1333 Admiralty |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 04, 2024 2:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Asterope Shipping Co. Ltd
|
|
Defendant
M/V ST. PAUL, IMO: 9623051
|
|
Garnishee
Master of the M/V ST.PAUL
|
|
Plaintiff
CSC Sugar LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Sunday, April 14, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Sun 04/14 4:58 PM
NOTICE by CSC Sugar LLC re10 Writ Issued,9 Warrant Issued - Provision of Security(Simms, J) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Security/Letter of Undertaking | ||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
corresp
Miscellaneous
Fri 04/12 9:41 AM
Correspondence re: (Consent) Line to withdraw Request for Rule E(4)(f) Hearing (Simms, J) |
|
order
Order
Fri 04/12 7:38 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER: Pursuant to the filing at ECF13 , a hearing is scheduled for Friday, April 12, 2024, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 3A. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 4/12/2024. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk) |
||
order
Order
Fri 04/12 9:55 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER: In view of the Consent Line filed at ECF No.16 , the hearing scheduled for Friday, April 12, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. is cancelled. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 4/12/2024. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/11 5:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander M Giles on behalf of Asterope Shipping Co. Ltd (Giles, Alexander) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Request for Hearing
Thu 04/11 4:35 PM
Emergency Request for Hearing Pursuant to Supplemental Rule E(4)(f) and Local Admiralty Rule (e)(8) (Giles, Alexander) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/11 4:31 PM
NOTICE by Asterope Shipping Co. Ltd of Verified Statement of Interest Pursuant to Supplemental Rule C(6) (Giles, Alexander) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/04 5:00 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Asterope Shipping Co. Ltd.(bw5s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
10 | 10
order
Writ Issued
Thu 04/04 4:31 PM
Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment issued as to party (bw5s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
9 | 9
order
Warrant Issued
Thu 04/04 4:25 PM
WARRANT of Arrest in REM issued (bw5s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 04/04 4:21 PM
ORDER granting5 MOTION re1 Complaint for Appointment of Substitute Custodian. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/4/2024. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
7 | 7
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 04/04 4:20 PM
ORDER granting4 MOTION re1 Complaint for Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/4/2024. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem
Thu 04/04 4:19 PM
ORDER granting3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/4/2024. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 04/04 2:03 PM
MOTION re1 Complaint for Appointment of Substitute Custodian by CSC Sugar LLC(Simms, J) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 04/04 2:01 PM
MOTION re1 Complaint for Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment by CSC Sugar LLC(Simms, J) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment | ||
3 | 3
motion
Issuance of Warrant in rem
Thu 04/04 1:57 PM
MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by CSC Sugar LLC(Simms, J) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Warrant | ||
2 | 2
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/04 1:29 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by CSC Sugar LLC (Simms, J) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/04 1:28 PM
COMPLAINT against Asterope Shipping Co. Ltd, M/V ST. PAUL, Master of the M/V ST.PAUL ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11185148.), filed by CSC Sugar LLC.(Simms, J) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/04 3:31 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin. Magistrate Judge Adam B. Abelson no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk) |