Kasper v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | P K Holmes III |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-02044 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Consent/Reassignment - SSA
Tue 04/09 10:40 AM
REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT to a District Judge for entry of the final judgment or order by Minnie L. Kasper. (McKinnon, Laura) |
|
misc
Clerk's Order of Judge Assignment
Tue 04/09 12:17 PM
TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT to a District Judge. Case reassigned to presiding judge Honorable P. K. Holmes III and Honorable Mark E. Ford, as the referral judge. (jlm) |
||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service as to USA
Fri 04/05 9:39 AM
Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 4/4/2024, answer due 6/3/2024. (jlm) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/05 9:30 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit and DIRECTING SERVICE on the Social Security Administration Commissioner and the US Attorney for the Western District/Arkansas via notice of electronic filing without prepayment of fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to note the date of service on the docket sheet. Further, the Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on April 5, 2024. (cla) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Magistrate Notice - SSA
Fri 04/05 8:20 AM
NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 4/19/2024.(jlm) |
|
Att: 1 consent/reassignment form | ||
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/04 6:56 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Minnie L. Kasper. (McKinnon, Laura) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/04 6:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Minnie L. Kasper.(McKinnon, Laura) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/04 8:18 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Minnie L. Kasper. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed. A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (jlm) |