California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando M Olguin
Referred: Karen L Stevenson
Case #: 2:24-cv-02734
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2024
Terminated:Jul 08, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 01, 2024 1:22 AM PDT
Defendant
LBSW LLC
Represented By
Donald R Brown
Manatt Phelps And Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Lamar Myers
Represented By
Jason T. Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Kevin Hyunjong Hong
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J. Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
General Auto Service and Repair Inc.
Terminated: 06/11/2024


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, July 11, 2024
19 19 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Thu 07/11 3:32 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Lamar Myers. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
18 18 judgmentCV Judgment Tue 07/09 12:28 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ADJUDGED THAT the above-captioned action is dismissed without prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (iv)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Dismissing Case Tue 07/09 12:25 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ORDERED that judgment be entered dismissing this action, without prejudice, for failure to prosecute and comply with the orders of the court. (iv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
16 16 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 06/11 4:00 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT GENERAL AUTO SERVICE AND REPAIR INC. by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
15 15 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Tue 05/28 9:07 AM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to General Auto Service and Repair Inc. (iv)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
14 14 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Fri 05/24 4:54 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to LBSW LLC answer now due 6/28/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant LBSW LLC.(Attorney Donald R Brown added to party LBSW LLC(pty:dft))(Brown, Donald)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Clerk to Enter Default Fri 05/24 11:47 AM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant General Auto Service and Repair Inc. filed by plaintiff Lamar Myers. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 05/10 3:08 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lamar Myers, upon Defendant LBSW LLC served on 5/8/2024, answer due 5/29/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon ROBERT DURAN, AS AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 05/01 4:10 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lamar Myers, upon Defendant General Auto Service and Repair Inc. served on 4/26/2024, answer due 5/17/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CARLOS FLORES, AS AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 04/11 2:09 PM
STANDING ORDER RE: DISABILITY CASES by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
9 9 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 04/05 2:04 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 04/05 9:53 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants General Auto Service and Repair Inc., LBSW LLC. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 04/05 9:43 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 04/05 9:42 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 04/05 9:41 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (et)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
4 4 notice Summons Request Thu 04/04 12:02 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Lamar Myers. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 04/04 12:02 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 04/04 12:01 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lamar Myers. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 04/04 12:01 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37225567 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J. Kim added to party Lamar Myers(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]