Andrews Engineering, Inc. v. Environmental Operations, Inc.
Illinois Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark A Beatty |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01046 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Case in other court: | St. Clair County Circuit Court, 24-LA-0250 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 04, 2024 2:09 PM CDT |
Defendant
Environmental Operations, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrews Engineering, Inc.
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice Upon Consent to Trial by Magistrate
Tue 04/30 9:52 AM
NOTICE: All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty is ASSIGNED to conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. All future documents must bear case number 24-1046 MAB. Any District Judge previously assigned will no longer be assigned to this case. (aca) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/29 2:11 PM
CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Rolf, David) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice Extending Consent Deadline
Mon 04/29 12:17 PM
NOTICE: Andrews Engineering was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, Andrews Engineering shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. Consent due by 5/6/2024 (aca) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/09 12:55 PM
Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Andrews Engineering, Inc.. (Rolf, David) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 04/09 11:25 AM
ORDER GRANTING14 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant's Answer or other responsive pleading is now due on or before May 2, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 4/9/2024. (scm) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/09 10:24 AM
ORDER granting Attorney Rolf on behalf of Andrews Engineering, Inc.15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (jle) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/08 1:54 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David A. Rolf $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-5359784 by on behalf of Andrews Engineering, Inc.. (Rolf, David) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 04/08 12:38 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Environmental Operations, Inc.. (Golterman, Robert) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/08 12:36 PM
CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Golterman, Robert) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
discov
Disclosure of Interested Parties
Fri 04/05 12:37 PM
DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Environmental Operations, Inc..(Golterman, Robert) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Fri 04/05 12:27 PM
Letter to Attorney Rolf regarding admissions. (tkm) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Action
Fri 04/05 10:10 AM
NOTICE OF ACTION to Andrew Engineering Inc.: Because the required Disclosure Statement was not filed with the attached, this matter is being submitted to the presiding judge for further action. A copy of this Court's form Disclosure Statement can be found at[LINK:https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/forms-0] . (tkm) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Initial Magistrate Assignment
Fri 04/05 10:01 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Orders 347 and 367. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or non-consent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: All Parties. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience:[LINK:https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/sites/ilsd/files/BenefitsofConsent.pdf] . All future documents must bear case number 24-1046 MAB. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 4/26/2024 (tkm) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/04 2:20 PM
NOTICE by Environmental Operations, Inc. of Filing Notice of Removal with State Court(Golterman, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice Striking Electronically Filed Documents
Thu 04/04 2:12 PM
NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking5 Notice (Other) filed by Environmental Operations, Inc.. Per call from attorney's office, exhibit 1 was filed in error. Document 5 stricken and will be re-filed this date. (jaj) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/04 1:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Evan Jefferson on behalf of Environmental Operations, Inc. (Jefferson, Evan) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/04 1:29 PM
ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE by Environmental Operations, Inc. of Filing Notice of Removal with State Court(Golterman, Robert) Modified on 4/4/2024 (jaj) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/04 1:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Golterman on behalf of Environmental Operations, Inc. (Golterman, Robert) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/04 1:24 PM
Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Environmental Operations, Inc.. (Golterman, Robert) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/04 1:14 PM
NOTICE by Environmental Operations, Inc. to Plaintiff of Filing Notice of Removal (Golterman, Robert) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 04/04 1:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Clair County Circuit Court, case number 24-LA-0250 ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AILSDC-5357460), filed by Environmental Operations, Inc..(Golterman, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 State Court Complaint Ex 1, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Ex 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex 3 |