Cristofoletti et al v. Transform SR, LLC et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Ronnie Abrams |
Case #: | 1:24-mc-00166 |
Cause | M 08-85 Motion to Compel |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 29, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Transfer
Mon 04/29 8:59 AM
CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of Illinois.(tg) |
||
misc
Received Acknowledgment (Electronic Case Transfer)
Mon 04/29 2:16 PM
Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Northern District of Illinois acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 1:24-cv-03435, filed on 4/29/2024. (rju) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Compel
Mon 04/22 3:25 PM
ORDER granting1 Motion to Compel. Plaintiffs' motion to compel the subpoena served on LG Electronics is hereby transferred to the Northern District of Illinois. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion pending at ECF No. 1 and to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/22/2024) (tg) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 04/09 9:04 PM
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Phoebe A. Wilkinson dated April 9, 2024 re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel LG Electronics USA, Inc. to produce or to transfer motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(f) . Other Court Name: United States District Court - Northern District of Illinois. Other C . Document filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc...(Wilkinson, Phoebe) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/09 9:00 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Phoebe Anne Wilkinson on behalf of LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc...(Wilkinson, Phoebe) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/09 8:58 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel Lee Zimmerman on behalf of LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc...(Zimmerman, Samuel) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
misc
Case Opening Fee Paid via Pay.gov
Fri 04/05 12:31 PM
Miscellaneous Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel LG Electronics USA, Inc. to produce or to transfer motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(f) . Other Court Name: United States District Court - Northern District of Illinois. Other C. Filing fee $ 52.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-29175791, paid on 4/4/2024..(vba) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/05 12:34 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vba) |
||
notice
Miscellaneous Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 04/05 12:37 PM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] . .(vba) |
||
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Certificate of Service Other
Thu 04/04 7:39 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion to transfer or compel and request for conference served on LG Electronics USA, Inc. on April 4, 2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by James Cristofoletti, Caroline Hatchett, Anthony Latuja, Dean Nicosia..(Tusa, Joseph) |
|
3 | 3
service
Certificate of Service Other
Thu 04/04 7:37 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion to transfer or compel and request for conference served on Transform SR, LLC and Transform SR Brands Management, LLC on April 4, 2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by James Cristofoletti, Caroline Hatchett, Anthony Latuja, Dean Nicosia..(Tusa, Joseph) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Miscellaneous Cover Sheet
Thu 04/04 3:00 PM
MISCELLANEOUS COVER SHEET filed..(Tusa, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Compel
Thu 04/04 2:58 PM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel LG Electronics USA, Inc. to produce or to transfer motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(f) . Other Court Name: United States District Court - Northern District of Illinois. Other Court Case Number: 23-cv-1318-JFK. Document filed by James Cristofoletti, Caroline Hatchett, Anthony Latuja, Dean Nicosia.(Tusa, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Subpoena, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Subpoena Written Response, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Website Pages - Compressors |