California Central District Court
Judge:Wesley L Hsu
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 2:24-cv-02741
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:2271 Federal Tort Claims Act
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2024
Terminated:Feb 05, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 01, 2024 1:23 AM PDT
Defendant
The United States of America
Represented By
Joseph William Tursi
Ausa - Us Attorneys Office
contact info
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Robert A Parris
Represented By
Robert A Parris
Robert A. Parris, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Soriano
Represented By
Brian Scott Detrick
Detrick Law Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
23 23 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 02/06 9:36 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE22 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. IT IS ORDERED that, pursuant to the separately filed Stipulation for Dismissal, this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party to bear its own costs, fees, and expenses. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
22 22 stip Dismiss Case Mon 02/03 3:13 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendant The United States of America.(Tursi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 17, 2025
21 21 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 01/21 9:56 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT REQUEST TO VACATE ALL PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES20 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. The Court sets an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for March 14, 2025 at 1:00 p.m. If a dismissal is not filed by March 7, 2025, counsel shall file a response to the Order to Show Cause, which includes the status of the settlement and the anticipated date the dismissal will be filed. (lom)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
20 20 notice Settlement Fri 01/10 9:31 AM
NOTICE of Settlement AND JOINT REQUEST TO VACATE ALL PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES filed by Defendant The United States of America.(Tursi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
19 19 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Tue 09/24 7:56 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Robert A Parris has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
18 18 adr Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2) Mon 09/23 2:18 PM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Robert Parris may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. All parties and the Panel Mediator have agreed that the mediation will be held on 1/17/2025 and counsel will submit mediation statements seven (7) calendar days before the session. Filed by Defendant The United States of America(Tursi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
17 17 13 pgs order Order Wed 08/28 2:22 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (see document for further details) (bm)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 08/28 2:20 PM
CIVIL PRETRIAL SCHEDULE AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: The Scheduling Conference scheduled for 8/30/2024 is hereby VACATED. The pretrial schedule governing this case is set forth in the far right column labeled "Court Order" located on the parties' Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet, which accompanies this Order. Court Trial: (Monday at 9:00 a.m.): 6/9/2025; Final Pretrial Conference: (Friday at 3:00 p.m.): 5/16/2025 (see document for further details) (bm)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) Wed 08/28 1:39 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 4/14/25. (hc)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
14 14 order Protective Order Fri 08/16 2:20 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim re Stipulation for Protective Order13 . (see document for details (hr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
13 13 stip Protective Order Thu 08/15 9:27 AM
Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant The United States of America.(Tursi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, August 05, 2024
12 12 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 08/05 11:48 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Meeting ; estimated length of trial 2 to 3 court days, filed by Defendant The United States of America..(Tursi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Monday, July 15, 2024
11 11 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 07/15 10:44 AM
ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. A Scheduling Conference is set for 8/30/2024 at 01:00 PM. See Attached Order for Details. (hc)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 07/12 8:47 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant The United States of America.(Attorney Joseph William Tursi added to party The United States of America(pty:dft))(Tursi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 04/09 7:58 AM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO Judge Wesley L. Hsu. (hc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 04/08 4:08 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant The United States of America. (jtil)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 04/08 10:14 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (cbr)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 04/08 10:13 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (cbr)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 04/08 10:13 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Wesley L. Hsu and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
4 4 notice Summons Request Thu 04/04 1:23 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 filed by Plaintiff Mark Soriano. (Detrick, Brian)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 04/04 1:18 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mark Soriano, (Detrick, Brian)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 04/04 1:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Mark Soriano. (Detrick, Brian)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 04/04 1:02 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37226094 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Mark Soriano. (Attorney Brian Scott Detrick added to party Mark Soriano(pty:bkmov))(Detrick, Brian)
Related: [-]