MEYER et al v. TRECOTTA, LLC DBA AVERR AGLOW
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Arthur J Schwab |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00094 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 04, 2024 4:08 PM EDT |
Defendant
TRECOTTA, LLC DBA AVERR AGLOW
|
|
Plaintiff
Karen Clayton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JESSICA MEYER
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 49 minutes ago |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
6
pgs
order
Order of Consolidation (Docket on Member Case Only)
Thu 04/18 11:49 AM
Order of Consolidation. This case is consolidated with 2:24-cv-489, the lead case. All pleadings, Motions and other papers hereafter filed shall be filed at 2:24-cv-489. The Clerk of Court shall mark this case closed. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 4/18/2024. (lar) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/05 7:54 AM
Summons Issued as to TRECOTTA, LLC (kss) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required)
Thu 04/04 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT against TRECOTTA, LLC DBA AVERR AGLOW (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8200451), filed by JESSICA MEYER, Karen Clayton. (Sweet, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 04/05 7:49 AM
Judge Arthur J. Schwab added. (kss) |