TWIN PLAZA BUILDING, LLC v. SENECA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Marilyn J Horan |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00507 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Case in other court: | The Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, PA, GD 24-001327 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 04, 2024 4:08 PM EDT |
Defendant
SENECA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TWIN PLAZA BUILDING, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Local Rule 16.1 Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 04/26 4:56 PM
INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/9/2024; Telephonic Initial Case Management set for 5/16/2024 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 4/26/2024. (bjl) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
7 | 7
order
Order
Fri 04/26 11:32 AM
STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE available[LINK:Here] . Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 4/26/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2))
Fri 04/12 11:18 AM
Disclosure Statement identifying Troy Development Associates LP as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by TWIN PLAZA BUILDING, LLC. (Tull, Stephan) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2))
Fri 04/12 11:07 AM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by TWIN PLAZA BUILDING, LLC. (Tull, Stephan) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
misc
QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/09 1:28 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re4 Disclosure Statement. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying both all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public AND citizenship as required pursuant to both LR 7.1.A and FRCvP 7.1(a)(2). CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 4/16/2024. (rtm) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2))
Mon 04/08 11:52 AM
Disclosure Statement identifying Crum & Forster Insurance as corporate parent or other affiliate by SENECA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.. (Miller, Brant) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Errata (to be used by filers)
Mon 04/08 11:46 AM
Errata re Quality Control message - Generic Correction by SENECA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.. Reason for Correction: Adding Cause of Action to Civil Cover Sheet. (Miller, Brant) |
|
misc
QC - Generic (only use if no other QC events apply)
Mon 04/08 10:03 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Cause of action not listed on civil cover sheet. CORRECTION: Refile corrected civil cover sheet using the event errata. (rtm) |
||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 04/05 2:38 PM
Judge Marilyn J. Horan Presiding. (rtm) |
||
misc
QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/05 2:41 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re2 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public as required pursuant to both LR 7.1.A and FRCvP 7.1(a)(2). CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 4/12/2024. (rtm) |
||
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/04 4:17 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by SENECA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.. (Miller, Brant) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
ATTORNEY Notice of Removal (Credit Card Required)
Thu 04/04 3:55 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, Pennsylvania, case number GD-24-001327. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8200406), filed by SENECA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.. (Miller, Brant) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Docket Sheet Docket Sheet from Common Pleas Court of Allegheny County |