Connecticut District Court
Judge:Vernon D Oliver
Referred: Robert A Richardson
Case #: 3:24-cv-00620
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2024
Terminated:Jun 24, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court, WWM-CV24-6029016-S
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 01, 2024 4:21 AM EDT
Defendant
Retail Data, LLC
Represented By
Shawn Randall Fox
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Richard J. Batzler
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Malana Winsor
Represented By
Lorenzo J. Cicchiello
Cicchiello & Cicchiello
contact info
John Erich Sheer
Cicchiello & Cicchiello
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
38 38 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 07/24 9:26 AM
ORDER granting 36 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John E. Sheer terminated as counsel for the plaintiff. Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 7/24/2024.(Dao, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
37 37 minutes Status Conference Tue 07/23 3:01 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: A telephonic Status Conference was held on 7/23/2024. 4 minutes. (Blickley, J)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 07/23 10:55 AM
MOTION for John E. Sheer to Withdraw as Attorney by Malana Winsor. (Sheer, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
35 35 utility Calendar Entry Mon 07/22 2:14 PM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 7/23/2024 at 02:30 PM before Judge Robert M. Spector. Please use the following dial-in for this call: (877) 873-8017; Access Code: 7040261. (Lee, E)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
notice Judicial Evaluation Program Survey Wed 06/26 8:10 AM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Samson, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
34 34 order Order Mon 06/24 12:14 PM
ORDER re 28 Notice of Settlement: This case has been reported as settled. Accordingly, rather than continue to keep the case open on the docket, the Clerk is directed to administratively close the file without prejudice to reopening on or before July 24, 2024 . See D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 41(b). Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 6/24/2024.(Dao, J)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
33 33 minutes Settlement Conference Fri 06/21 2:52 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: A Settlement Conference via Zoom was held on 6/21/2024. Total Time: 4 hours. This case has settled after a settlement conference today. The parties understand that the district judge may decide to close this case administratively under Local Rule 41(b). (Lee, E)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
32 32 order Order on Motion to Continue Mon 06/03 4:20 PM
ORDER granting 31 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for the parties to exchange initial disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) is extended to July 8, 2024 . Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 6/3/2024. (Dao, J)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Continue Mon 06/03 1:37 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue by Malana Winsor. (Sheer, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
30 30 3 pgs order Order Thu 05/23 4:59 PM
ORDER. A Settlement Conference is scheduled in this case for June 21, 2024, at 9:30 AM. Please see the attached Settlement Conference Order for detailed instructions and deadlines. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on May 23, 2024.(Blickley, J)
Related: [-]
29 29 utility Calendar Entry Thu 05/23 4:56 PM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Settlement Conference via Zoom is set for June 21, 2024, at 09:30 AM before Judge Robert M. Spector. (Blickley, J)
Related: [-]
28 28 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 05/23 4:50 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: A telephonic Pre-Settlement Conference was held on 5/23/2024. 9 minutes. (Blickley, J)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 05/22 10:19 AM
Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 2/3/2025; Status Reports due by 9/30/2024 and 2/18/2025 (Samson, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
27 27 utility Calendar Entry Tue 05/21 4:06 PM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Telephonic Pre-Settlement Conference is set for May 23, 2024, at 04:30 PM before Judge Robert M. Spector. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. As the Court requires parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend (in-person or by remote means) the settlement conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next 60 days and have their own calendars available to aid in the scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the discussions to be productive. Please use the following dial-in for this call: (877) 873-8017; Access Code: 7040261 . (Blickley, J)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Scheduling Order Tue 05/21 1:51 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties' proposed scheduling order24 is approved as amended. Initial disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) must be exchanged by June 4, 2024 . Discovery due by February 3, 2025 . The parties shall take the first step to initiate any dispositive motion practice by February 18, 2025 . Status reports due on September 30, 2024 and February 18, 2025 . Please see the attached for additional deadlines. The parties also request an early settlement conference before a Magistrate Judge; a separate referral order shall issue. Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 5/21/2024.(Dao, J)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 05/21 1:15 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Spector to conduct a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 5/21/2024.(Samson, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
24 24 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 05/20 7:21 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Fox, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/15 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn Randall Fox on behalf of Retail Data, LLC of Elizabeth P. Redpath (Fox, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
22 22 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/03 9:42 AM
ORDER granting21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Elizabeth P. Redpath.. Signed by Clerk on 5/3/2024. (Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
21 21 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/02 12:43 PM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Elizabeth P. Redpath to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Retail Data, LLC.(Fox, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/01 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Batzler on behalf of Retail Data, LLC (Batzler, Richard)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 05/01 11:50 AM
CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Richard J. Batzler to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7740892) by Retail Data, LLC. (Batzler, Richard)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/01 11:30 AM
ORDER. The motion17 is DENIED for failure to conform to Local Rule 83.1(d)(1)(b) (The motion shall be accompanied by an affidavit, duly sworn and executed by the proposed visiting attorney: identifying the bar of each court of which said attorney is and has ever been a member, and the corresponding bar identification number(s); or if no such numbers have been assigned, so stating.). The motion can be re-filed in accordance with the Local Rule. Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 5/1/2024. (Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
17 17 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/30 3:17 PM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Elizabeth P. Redpath to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7743334) by Retail Data, LLC.(Fox, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
16 16 misc Jury Demand Tue 04/30 2:29 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Malana Winsor. (Cicchiello, Lorenzo)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/30 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lorenzo J. Cicchiello on behalf of Malana Winsor (Cicchiello, Lorenzo)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/30 12:55 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard J. Batzler. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/29/2024. Signed by Clerk on 4/20/2024. (Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
13 13 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/29 1:19 PM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Richard J. Batzler to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7740892) by Retail Data, LLC. (Fox, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/15 8:57 AM
Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/18/2024 (Samson, J)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/11 11:33 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Retail Data, LLC.(Fox, Shawn)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/11 11:25 AM
NOTICE by Retail Data, LLC re2 Notice of Removal, Removal Statement (Fox, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
10 10 order Electronic Service Documents Mon 04/08 1:37 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of3 Notice (Other) filed by Retail Data, LLC, 4 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,8 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,1 Disclosure Statement filed by Retail Data, LLC,9 Notice,7 Standing Protective Order,2 Notice of Removal, filed by Retail Data, LLC,6 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 4/4/2024.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing order on removed cases
Thursday, April 04, 2024
9 9 notice Notice Mon 04/08 1:34 PM
Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 4/4/2024.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Initial Discovery Protocols Attachment
8 8 misc Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake) Mon 04/08 1:27 PM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Standing Protective Order (Intake) Mon 04/08 1:25 PM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 4/4/2024.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Electronic Filing Order Mon 04/08 1:22 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 4/4/2024.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Mon 04/08 1:12 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/3/2024 Discovery due by 10/4/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 11/8/2024 Signed by Clerk on 4/4/2024.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/04 5:26 PM
NOTICE by Retail Data, LLC of Pending Motions (Fox, Shawn)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 04/04 5:13 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Retail Data, LLC from Superior Court for the Judicial District of Windham at Putnam, case number WWM-CV24-6029016-S. Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACTDC-7711512, filed by Retail Data, LLC.(Fox, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
1 1 misc Disclosure Statement Thu 04/04 5:04 PM
Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Financial Interest Disclosure by Retail Data, LLC. (Fox, Shawn)
Related: [-]
notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Fri 04/05 12:38 PM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 4/4/2024.(Perez, J.)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 04/05 12:54 PM
Judge Vernon D. Oliver and Judge Robert A. Richardson added. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]