Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Mary S Scriven
Referred: Sean P Flynn
Case #: 8:24-cv-00836
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2024
Re-opened:Aug 16, 2024
Terminated:Jul 17, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 01, 2024 4:33 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
AL Marketing Administrative Services, LLC
Represented By
Alexandra Marie Dragovich
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
John David Emmanuel
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info
Richard George Salazar
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info
Counter Claimant
AL Marketing, LLC
Represented By
Alexandra Marie Dragovich
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
John David Emmanuel
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info
Richard George Salazar
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Amerilife Group, LLC
Represented By
Alexandra Marie Dragovich
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
John David Emmanuel
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info
Richard George Salazar
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Brookstone Capital Management, LLC
Represented By
Alexandra Marie Dragovich
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
John David Emmanuel
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info
Richard George Salazar
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Independent Administrative Services, LLC
Represented By
Alexandra Marie Dragovich
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
John David Emmanuel
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info
Richard George Salazar
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Joshua Mellberg
Represented By
Dane Steffenson
Dane Law LLC
contact info
Craig E. Rothburd
Craig E. Rothburd, PA
contact info
Counter Defendant
Secure Investment Management, LLC
Represented By
Dane Steffenson
Dane Law LLC
contact info
Craig E. Rothburd
Craig E. Rothburd, PA
contact info
Defendant
Amerilife Group, LLC
Represented By
Alexandra Marie Dragovich
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
John David Emmanuel
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info
Richard George Salazar
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info
Defendant
Brookstone Capital Management, LLC
Represented By
Alexandra Marie Dragovich
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
John David Emmanuel
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info
Richard George Salazar
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info
Defendant
Independent Administrative Services, LLC
Represented By
Alexandra Marie Dragovich
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
John David Emmanuel
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info
Richard George Salazar
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info
Defendant
AL Marketing, LLC
Represented By
Alexandra Marie Dragovich
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
John David Emmanuel
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info
Richard George Salazar
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joshua Mellberg
Represented By
Dane Steffenson
Dane Law LLC
contact info
Craig E. Rothburd
Craig E. Rothburd, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Secure Investment Management, LLC
Represented By
Dane Steffenson
Dane Law LLC
contact info
Craig E. Rothburd
Craig E. Rothburd, PA
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
AL Marketing Administrative Services, LLC
Terminated: 05/10/2024
Represented By
Alexandra Marie Dragovich
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
John David Emmanuel
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info
Richard George Salazar
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
164 164 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 04/25 12:01 PM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 163 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Disqualify Defendants' Counsel and Representative. Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Disqualify Defendants' Counsel and Representative no more than fourteen (14) days after the Court has entered an Order on Plaintiffs' Amended Time Sensitive Motion at Docket 104. (See also Dkts. 126, 131). Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/25/2025. (KMA)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
163 163 motion Extension of Time to File Mon 04/21 2:49 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Disqualify Defendants' Counsel and Representative by AL Marketing, LLC, Amerilife Group, LLC, Brookstone Capital Management, LLC, Independent Administrative Services, LLC. (Emmanuel, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
162 162 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 04/18 10:18 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re148 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Joshua Mellberg, Secure Investment Management, LLC.(Steffenson, Dane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Chart
161 161 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 04/18 5:49 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re145 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts II - V filed by Amerilife Group, LLC, Independent Administrative Services, LLC. (Salazar, Richard)
Related: [-]
160 160 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 04/18 5:23 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re146 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts VII-IV* filed by Brookstone Capital Management, LLC. (Salazar, Richard)
Related: [-]
159 159 notice Notice of appearance Fri 04/18 11:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Tozian on behalf of Joshua Mellberg (Tozian, Scott)
Related: [-]