Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Barry W Ashe
Referred: Donna Phillips Currault
Case #: 2:24-cv-00857
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2024
Terminated:Aug 07, 2024
Case in other court:24th JDC for the Parish of Jefferson, 845-103
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 01, 2024 3:34 AM CDT
Defendant
CVL Transport, LLC
Represented By
Doris A. Royce
Derouen Law Firm
contact info
William Quinton Gurley, III
Derouen Law Firm
contact info
Patrick Dominic DeRouen
Derouen Law Firm
contact info
Levi Darby Henderson
Derouen Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Chaun Vincell Lewis
Represented By
Doris A. Royce
Derouen Law Firm
contact info
William Quinton Gurley, III
Derouen Law Firm
contact info
Patrick Dominic DeRouen
Derouen Law Firm
contact info
Levi Darby Henderson
Derouen Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Progressive Express Insurance Company
Represented By
Doris A. Royce
Derouen Law Firm
contact info
William Quinton Gurley, III
Derouen Law Firm
contact info
Patrick Dominic DeRouen
Derouen Law Firm
contact info
Levi Darby Henderson
Derouen Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Phi Nguyen
Represented By
Seth T. Mansfield
Mansfield, Melancon, Cranmer & Dick, LLC
contact info
Kelley Randley Dick, Jr.
Mansfield, Melancon, Cranmer, & Dick, Llc (new Orleans)
contact info
Scott Michael Mansfield
Mansfield, Melancon, Cranmer, & Dick, Llc (new Orleans)
contact info
Collin Roy Melancon
Mansfield, Melancon, Cranmer, & Dick, Llc (new Orleans)
contact info
Roger W. Jordan, Jr.
Roger W. Jordan, Jr.
contact info
Brad Wesley Cranmer
Mansfield, Melancon, Cranmer, & Dick (baton Rouge)
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, August 29, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 08/29 3:09 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 8/29/2024. (clc)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Thu 08/29 11:52 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re18 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice . Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte' and remove submission date. (go)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Dismiss Thu 08/29 11:01 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Progressive Express Insurance Company, CVL Transport, LLC, Chaun Vincell Lewis and Phi Nguyen.(Gurley, William) Modified Text/filers on 8/29/2024 (go)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 08/07 1:25 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 8/7/2024.(clc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
16 16 order Scheduling Order Thu 07/11 4:34 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/2025 10:00 AM before Judge Barry W Ashe. Jury Trial set for 4/28/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Barry W Ashe. All discovery must be completed by 3/25/2025. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 7/11/2024.(clc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 06/11 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2024 03:30 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (clc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
14 14 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Wed 05/22 9:13 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re12 Answer to Complaint - Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 1. (gla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
13 13 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Tue 05/21 2:03 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by CVL Transport, LLC (Gurley, William)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 05/21 1:55 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by CVL Transport, LLC.(Gurley, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/08 12:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Chaun Vincell Lewis served on 5/3/2024, answer due 5/24/2024. (Melancon, Collin) (Main Document 11 replaced on 5/8/2024 to correct image) (clc). Modified on 5/8/2024 (clc)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/08 12:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; CVL Transport, LLC served on 5/2/2024, answer due 5/23/2024. (Melancon, Collin) (Main Document 10 replaced on 5/8/2024 to correct image) (clc). Modified on 5/8/2024 (clc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued Fri 04/26 11:19 AM
Summons Issued as to CVL Transport, LLC, Chaun Vincell Lewis.(clc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
8 8 service Request for Summons Issued Wed 04/24 2:52 PM
Request of Summons Issued as to Chaun Vincell Lewis filed by Phi Nguyen re1 Notice of Removal,,,. (Melancon, Collin)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Request for Summons Issued Wed 04/24 2:51 PM
Request of Summons Issued as to CVL Transport, LLC filed by Phi Nguyen re1 Notice of Removal,,,. (Melancon, Collin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
6 6 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Tue 04/09 9:12 AM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Progressive Express Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Progressive Express Insurance Company for Progressive Express Insurance Company (Gurley, William)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Compliance Tue 04/09 9:02 AM
Notice of Compliance by All Defendants re1 Notice of Removal,,,. (Gurley, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order Mon 04/08 3:38 PM
DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Chaun Vincell Lewis, Progressive Express Insurance Company, CVL Transport, LLC. (lb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
3 3 misc Initial Case Assignment Thu 04/04 5:04 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (ess)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Submitted Thu 04/04 3:43 PM
Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Gurley, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 04/04 3:41 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 24th JDC for the Parish of Jefferson, case number 845-103 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10471028) filed by Progressive Express Insurance Company, Chaun Vincell Lewis, CVL Transport, LLC.Attorney William Quinton Gurley, III added to party CVL Transport, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney William Quinton Gurley, III added to party Chaun Vincell Lewis(pty:dft), Attorney William Quinton Gurley, III added to party Progressive Express Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Gurley, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1- Petition,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2- CVL Transport Entity Detail,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3- Plaintiff's Disc Response,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4- State Court Record,
Att: 6 State Court Pleadings State Removal