Gamma Mu Chapter of Kappa Alpha Theta Fraternity et al v. Bond et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Deborah L Boardman |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00992 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act - Civil Action for Deprivation of Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 04, 2024 5:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
James Bond
|
|
Defendant
James McShay
|
|
Defendant
Patricia Perillo
|
|
Defendant
Darryll Pines
|
|
Defendant
University of Maryland College Park
|
|
Plaintiff
Jane Does 1-6
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gamma Mu Chapter of Kappa Alpha Theta Fraternity
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/23 6:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Joyce Bradley on behalf of All Defendants (Bradley, Kathryn) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 04/22 5:20 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time. The University and individual defendants' responses to the amended complaint are due June 17, 2024. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 4/22/2024. (lmys, Chambers) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 04/18 1:31 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by James Bond, James McShay, Patricia Perillo, Darryll Pines, University of Maryland College Park |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 04/17 4:19 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gamma Mu Chapter of Kappa Alpha Theta Fraternity, Jane Does 1-6. Darryll Pines waiver sent on 4/17/2024, answer due 6/17/2024.(Carry, Alfred) |
|
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 04/17 4:18 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gamma Mu Chapter of Kappa Alpha Theta Fraternity, Jane Does 1-6. Patricia Perillo waiver sent on 4/17/2024, answer due 6/17/2024.(Carry, Alfred) |
|
10 | 10
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 04/17 4:16 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gamma Mu Chapter of Kappa Alpha Theta Fraternity, Jane Does 1-6. James McShay waiver sent on 4/17/2024, answer due 6/17/2024.(Carry, Alfred) |
|
9 | 9
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 04/17 4:15 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gamma Mu Chapter of Kappa Alpha Theta Fraternity, Jane Does 1-6. James Bond waiver sent on 4/17/2024, answer due 6/17/2024.(Carry, Alfred) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/15 3:33 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gamma Mu Chapter of Kappa Alpha Theta Fraternity, Jane Does 1-6. University of Maryland College Park served on 4/12/2024, answer due 5/3/2024.(Carry, Alfred) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/15 3:31 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gamma Mu Chapter of Kappa Alpha Theta Fraternity, Jane Does 1-6. Darryll Pines served on 4/12/2024, answer due 5/3/2024.(Carry, Alfred) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/15 3:27 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gamma Mu Chapter of Kappa Alpha Theta Fraternity, Jane Does 1-6. Patricia Perillo served on 4/12/2024, answer due 5/3/2024.(Carry, Alfred) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/15 3:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gamma Mu Chapter of Kappa Alpha Theta Fraternity, Jane Does 1-6. James McShay served on 4/12/2024, answer due 5/3/2024.(Carry, Alfred) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/15 3:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gamma Mu Chapter of Kappa Alpha Theta Fraternity, Jane Does 1-6. James Bond served on 4/12/2024, answer due 5/3/2024.(Carry, Alfred) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/08 12:40 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to James Bond, James McShay, Patricia Perillo, Darryll Pines, University of Maryland College Park. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/08 12:35 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Deborah L. Boardman. Judge Paula Xinis no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/04 4:32 PM
NOTICE by Jane Does 1-6, Gamma Mu Chapter of Kappa Alpha Theta Fraternity OF RELATED CASES (Carry, Alfred) |
|
1 | 1
20
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/04 4:26 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11185855.), filed by Gamma Mu Chapter of Kappa Alpha Theta Fraternity, Jane Does 1-6.(Carry, Alfred) |
|
Att: 1 Ex. A, | ||
Att: 2 Ex. B, | ||
Att: 3 Ex. C, | ||
Att: 4 Ex. D, | ||
Att: 5 Ex. E, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Summons, | ||
Att: 11 Summons |