Center for Biological Diversity et al v. National Marine Fisheries Service
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Gregory H Woods |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02576 |
Nature of Suit | 895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act |
Cause | 05:552 Freedom of Information Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 04, 2024 6:08 PM EDT |
Defendant
National Marine Fisheries Service
|
|
Plaintiff
Animal Welfare Institute
900 Pennsylvania Avenue, SE
Washington, DC 20003 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Center for Biological Diversity
P.O. Box 710
Tucson, AZ 85702 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Natural Resources Defense Council
40 West 20th Street 11th Floor
New York, NY 10011 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/10 8:21 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Sarah Uhlemann to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (wv) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/09 3:03 PM
AMENDED MOTION for Sarah Uhlemann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Animal Welfare Institute, Center for Biological Diversity..(Uhlemann, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing Corrected, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Sarah Uhlemann Pro Hac Vice, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice | ||
misc
Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/09 9:38 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 10 MOTION for Sarah Uhlemann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29189996. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Oregon;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bc) |
||
misc
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
Tue 04/09 3:22 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 11 AMENDED MOTION for Sarah Uhlemann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/08 4:48 PM
MOTION for Sarah Uhlemann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29189996. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Animal Welfare Institute, Center for Biological Diversity..(Uhlemann, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Sarah Uhlemann, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission | ||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/05 4:39 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Christina S. Marshall to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (wv) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/05 4:21 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Xavier Q. Lawrence to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (wv) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/05 3:49 PM
MOTION for Christina S. Marshall to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29182216. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Animal Welfare Institute, Center for Biological Diversity, Natural Resources Defense Council..(Marshall, Christina) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Christina S. Marshall, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit CSM Good Standing Certificates, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/05 3:24 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Marine Fisheries Service..(pc) |
|
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Fri 04/05 2:44 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/6/2024 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, which are available on the Court's website. Rule 2 of the Court's Individual Rules contains the dial-in number for the conference and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(B) of the Court's Individual Rules. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/5/2024) (rro) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 04/05 11:42 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 04/05 11:43 AM
Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/05 11:43 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
Fri 04/05 4:28 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 7 MOTION for Christina S. Marshall to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29182216. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz) |
||
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/04 4:47 PM
MOTION for Xavier Q. Lawrence to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29177228. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Animal Welfare Institute, Center for Biological Diversity, Natural Resources Defense Council..(Lawrence, Xavier) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Xavier Q. Lawrence, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit XQL Certificates of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/04 4:39 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Marine Fisheries Service, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Animal Welfare Institute, Center for Biological Diversity, Natural Resources Defense Council..(Lawrence, Xavier) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/04 4:35 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lawrence, Xavier) |
|
1 | 1
34
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/04 4:34 PM
COMPLAINT against National Marine Fisheries Service. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29177060)Document filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Animal Welfare Institute, Natural Resources Defense Council..(Lawrence, Xavier) |
|
misc
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
Thu 04/04 4:51 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 4 MOTION for Xavier Q. Lawrence to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29177228. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc) |