McGucken v. Microsoft Corporation et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Ronnie Abrams |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02578 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 04, 2024 5:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
Does 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Microsoft Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Elliot McGucken
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Thu 04/25 6:25 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Microsoft Corporation served on 4/15/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. Service was accepted by Microsoft Corporation c/o Corporation Service Company (Ellen Jones). Document filed by Elliot McGucken..(Burroughs, Scott) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Fri 04/12 12:24 PM
ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE:IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial status conference on June 7, 2024 at 4:00 p.m. Unless the parties request otherwise, the Court will hold this conference by telephone. The parties shall use the following dial-in information to call in to the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public. If Defendantshave not yet been properly served, have not filed a responsive pleading, and/or the parties otherwise seek to adjourn the conference, they shall notify the Court by no later than May 31, 2024. If Defendants have been properly served and the parties are available to proceed with an initial status conference prior to June 7, 2024, the parties shall notify the Court and propose an earlier date for the conference, as well as for submission of the status letter and proposed case management plan. Initial Conference set for 6/7/2024 at 04:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/12/2024) (rro) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted
Fri 04/05 3:44 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(pc) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/05 3:25 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Microsoft Corporation..(pc) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 04/05 1:16 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 04/05 1:18 PM
Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/05 1:19 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Fri 04/05 1:21 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Scott Burroughs. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Elliot McGucken, Microsoft Corporation. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Fri 04/05 1:21 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Scott Burroughs. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (pc) |
||
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/04 5:14 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Microsoft Corporation, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Elliot McGucken..(Burroughs, Scott) |
|
4 | 4
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney
Thu 04/04 5:07 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Burroughs, Scott) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/04 5:02 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Elliot McGucken..(Burroughs, Scott) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/04 4:58 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Burroughs, Scott) |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/04 4:38 PM
COMPLAINT against Does 1-10, Microsoft Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29177128)Document filed by Elliot McGucken..(Burroughs, Scott) |