Tesla, Inc. v. The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Melissa Damian |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21263 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jan 13, 2025 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 01, 2024 4:28 AM EDT |
Defendant
Shop1102724142 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102724143 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102724144 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102724599 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102725574 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102726454 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102728449 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102728557 Store chenmarket03@163.com; 308 Shop1102712345 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102728559 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102735115 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102736073 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102745135 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102749393 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102749703 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102750090 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102751379 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102751704 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102752055 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102752331 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102753771 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102754087 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102765538 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102767554 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102771543 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102772745 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102773385 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102774665 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102774669 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102776328 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102776330 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102784320 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102786278 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102787465 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102787472 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102789457 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102790257 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102794623 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102814647 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102814655 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102816642 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102816646 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102816648 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102818025 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102818277 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102818598 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102818639 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102818643 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102819286 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102819628 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102823619 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102825475 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102826927 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102826937 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102828270 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102828387 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102829384 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102829385 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102830051 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102834326 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102836174 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102839575 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102839996 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102840847 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102844532 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102844536 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102845067 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102845543 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102846992 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102846994 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102855175 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102855799 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102856241 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102856494 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102858222 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102859168 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102860475 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102875206 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102881257 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102882235 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102882677 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102883245 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102883302 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102883588 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102884225 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102884230 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102887152 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102887944 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102888340 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102888345 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102888347 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102888774 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102889070 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102889140 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102890147 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102890334 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102890337 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102901507 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102901508 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102901509 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102903460 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102903472 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102904454 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102911518 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102923410 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102925298 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102926913 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102928286 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102929206 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102935074 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102939283 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102941305 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102946076 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102959304 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102960574 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102962438 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102963709 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102981768 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102982690 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102984562 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102984640 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102984694 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102986761 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102987494 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102988382 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102993706 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102994662 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102994663 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102998684 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102998704 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102999650 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103000265 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103005011 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103010197 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103011243 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103011568 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103011700 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103012646 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103014681 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103016375 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103020019 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103020050 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103029004 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103029044 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103039235 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103040285 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103053055 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103053203 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103053486 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103054508 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103054711 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103056969 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103057578 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103058115 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103063301 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103070486 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103077327 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103100193 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103103402 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103106113 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103107142 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103122015 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103130723 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103132566 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103132766 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103150525 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103155077 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103183093 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103191104 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103199082 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103207168 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103207781 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103219038 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop5003099 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop5008212 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop5072093 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop5232021 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop5286008 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop5361023 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop5373202 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop5585458 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop5606329 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop5796573 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop911137095 Store
|
|
Defendant
Si Ying Store
|
|
Defendant
Silly Cat Seven Seven Store
|
|
Defendant
Siteng 0413101 Store
|
|
Defendant
Siteng clothing 3 Store
|
|
Defendant
Siteng0413102 Store
|
|
Defendant
SuLi Professional Store
|
|
Defendant
Sunlighting Store
|
|
Defendant
Super auto parts Club Store
|
|
Defendant
T S L MODEL 3 MODEL Y CAR ACCESSORIES Store 2560428958@qq.com; 218 Shop1102901508 Store
|
|
Defendant
TESTOP Car Accessories Store
|
|
Defendant
TSLAccessories Store
|
|
Defendant
Tesla Online Store
|
|
Defendant
Tesla Trend Store
|
|
Defendant
This Is A Good Store
|
|
Defendant
Tiffanie Store
|
|
Defendant
Tiffiny Store
|
|
Defendant
Toys You Have Not Seen Store
|
|
Defendant
Triumph Car Parts Store
|
|
Defendant
TshirtLink Store
|
|
Defendant
Twobarrels Auto-life Store
|
|
Defendant
USESS Store
|
|
Defendant
USVOTOV Official Store
|
|
Defendant
Ufotable Store
|
|
Defendant
VWVIVIDWORLD Tesla Accessories Store
|
|
Defendant
Valentno Store
|
|
Defendant
Vinbrandmn Store
|
|
Defendant
Vinbrandmn-LY Store
|
|
Defendant
Vinbrandmn-XF Store
|
|
Defendant
Virtuous Circle Store
|
|
Defendant
WENSTON Store
|
|
Defendant
WHA accessory Store
|
|
Defendant
WayRaceter Store
|
|
Defendant
Wayraceter Official Store
|
|
Defendant
Wuhan Baina Automotive Supplies Co., Ltd
|
|
Defendant
XLYLXL Store
|
|
Defendant
XMCAR Store
|
|
Defendant
XY--eight Store
|
|
Defendant
Xiamen Fank Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Xiamen Hongxiang Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Xiamen Refresh Auto Parts Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
XingQiRi01 Store
|
|
Defendant
XingQiRi03 Store
|
|
Defendant
Xingyue (Guangzhou) Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Xinqichen Electronic Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Xishan District Yangjian Yuda Vehicle Parts Factory
|
|
Defendant
Xyzplus Store
|
|
Defendant
YH Car Store
|
|
Defendant
YJ Automobile Products Store
|
|
Defendant
YiYang-Tesla Store
|
|
Defendant
Yiwu Nice Show Accessories Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Yiwu Quanxi E-Commerce Firm
|
|
Defendant
Yiwu Wuzhao E-Commerce Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
You Socks Store
|
|
Defendant
YummYard Store
|
|
Defendant
Yunke Car Shop Store
|
|
Defendant
Z-Angel Store
|
|
Defendant
ZHEC Store
|
|
Defendant
ZUIDIDE Store
|
|
Defendant
ZUIMI Car Parts Store
|
|
Defendant
ZYJC Store
|
|
Defendant
Zona7 Store
|
|
Defendant
huiwentong Store
|
|
Defendant
misitelin Store
|
|
Defendant
rqzae Store
|
|
Defendant
super-new Store
|
|
Defendant
The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A
|
|
Defendant
219 YY Store
|
|
Defendant
33 yuan heng li zhen Store
|
|
Defendant
A Zhong Store
|
|
Defendant
ACC Perfect Store
|
|
Defendant
AE Auto Parts Store
|
|
Defendant
AEP Store
|
|
Defendant
AFAX Official Store
|
|
Defendant
ARDEN Store
|
|
Defendant
ART ON A WALL Store
|
|
Defendant
Accessories Model 3 Store
|
|
Defendant
Advance Car Parts Store
|
|
Defendant
Afly Store
|
|
Defendant
Afly Tesla Store
|
|
Defendant
Ali Special Offer Store
|
|
Defendant
Anhui Pingyao Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Anju Fashion Home Textiles 7 Store
|
|
Defendant
Anju Fashion Home Textiles 8 Store Store
|
|
Defendant
Attmore Autoparts Store
|
|
Defendant
Auto Accessories Club Store
|
|
Defendant
Awesome Socks Store
|
|
Defendant
BACKSJET Store
|
|
Defendant
BAINEL Auto Parts Official Store
|
|
Defendant
BB Master Store
|
|
Defendant
BOUTIQUE CAR KEY ACCESSORIES Store
|
|
Defendant
BOUTIQUE DIY CAR KEY ACCESSORIES Store
|
|
Defendant
Basketball T-shirt Hoodie Store
|
|
Defendant
Be Your Kitty Store
|
|
Defendant
Be Your Tesla Store
|
|
Defendant
Belief (changzhou) Plastics Company Limited
|
|
Defendant
Beneny Store
|
|
Defendant
Biothern Store
|
|
Defendant
Bittelan Store
|
|
Defendant
Bob Costume Store
|
|
Defendant
CHAMPRINT Top Store
|
|
Defendant
Car Accessories Official Store
|
|
Defendant
Car Accessories YZ Store
|
|
Defendant
Car Badge Decals Store
|
|
Defendant
Car Decals Accessories Store
|
|
Defendant
Car Giant TPUPPF Vinyl Producer Store
|
|
Defendant
Car Logo Sport Baseball Cap Store
|
|
Defendant
Car Styling Stickers Store
|
|
Defendant
Car decoration industry Store
|
|
Defendant
Changzhou Lita Auto Accessories Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Changzhou Xingmiao Vehicle Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Chengdu Evoyage Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Chengdu Mingzhou Automobile Sales Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Ciesle Store
|
|
Defendant
City shine Store
|
|
Defendant
CoolWind Store
|
|
Defendant
Cubby Bricks Store
|
|
Defendant
D-I-Y Store
|
|
Defendant
DDH Tech 01 Store
|
|
Defendant
DDH Tech 03 Store
|
|
Defendant
DESIGNED MASK Store
|
|
Defendant
DIY6666 Store
|
|
Defendant
DRVRACES Racing Store
|
|
Defendant
DUTRIEUX Car Accessories Store
|
|
Defendant
Decoration 1 Shop Store
|
|
Defendant
Diecast Miniauto Store
|
|
Defendant
Dongguan Chiwei Metal Products Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Dongguan Nuoyu New Energy Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Dota Store
|
|
Defendant
Dropshop-Mtesla Store
|
|
Defendant
DuDuBee Store
|
|
Defendant
Dubee Store
|
|
Defendant
European and American boutique shirts Store
|
|
Defendant
Extreme Shirt Store
|
|
Defendant
Fashion Mesh Hat Store
|
|
Defendant
Fly Phone Case Store
|
|
Defendant
Foshan One Tree Culture Media Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
FunnyMan Store
|
|
Defendant
Futuristic Soldier Toys Store
|
|
Defendant
Fuzhou Infinity Trade Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Fuzhou Qingcheng Automobile Service Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
G04-Dropshipping-Online Store
|
|
Defendant
GY Auto Parts Home Store
|
|
Defendant
Gertrud Autoparts Store
|
|
Defendant
Ghost Car Merchant Store
|
|
Defendant
Givanc Store
|
|
Defendant
GoBricks Moc Factory Store
|
|
Defendant
Gobricks Moc Rebrickable Store
|
|
Defendant
Good Up Store
|
|
Defendant
Gresso Store
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Bailekai Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Baolan Fadier Leather Goods Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Cheyoubao Industry Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Cyrus Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Evenew Accessories Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Everbright Auto Accessories Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Fish Map E-Commerce Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Flowerie Technology Co., Limited
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Green Way Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Haocheng Auto Parts Co., Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Iron Box Auto Supplier Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Keming Electronics Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Kute Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Lightstar Optoelectronic Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Mipi Car Accessories Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Mojing Electronic Commerce Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Muxuan Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Qibin Automotive Products Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Rich Mechanical Parts Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Taiming Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Temart New Engergy Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Ushi Auto Parts Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Xingcheng Auto Parts Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Yaerde Automobile Products Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Yifeng Hardware Plastic Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Yikun Cross Border E-Commerce Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Yitao Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Zhengji Information Technology Co., Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Zhongmi Trading Co., Ltd
|
|
Defendant
HAHA One Store
|
|
Defendant
HHH Automobile Store
|
|
Defendant
HP2 Car Accessories Store Store
|
|
Defendant
HP3 Car Accessories Store
|
|
Defendant
HP4 Car Accessories Store Store
|
|
Defendant
HUOLLJ Store
|
|
Defendant
Haitai Auto Supply Store Store
|
|
Defendant
Halolo Store
|
|
Defendant
Hefei Bopar Auto Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Henan Mingtuo Automobile Sales Service Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Hennesy Store
|
|
Defendant
Hugoo Store
|
|
Defendant
Huizhou Lecheng E-Commercial Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Huizon Auto Accessories Store
|
|
Defendant
Its a Great Store
|
|
Defendant
JEBCON Official Store
|
|
Defendant
JGK Store
|
|
Defendant
Jdmsuperpower Store
|
|
Defendant
Jergir Store
|
|
Defendant
Jinan Mawang Benchmarking Automotive Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Jitty Store
|
|
Defendant
Jun Yang Fu Shi Store
|
|
Defendant
Kyson Store
|
|
Defendant
LBLMRC Official Store
|
|
Defendant
LI Auto-Moto Dedicated Store
|
|
Defendant
LOOOL Store
|
|
Defendant
Laneng Direct Store
|
|
Defendant
Lanzi Store
|
|
Defendant
Li Ang (Guangzhou) Vehicle Parts Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Lokonwis Decals Store
|
|
Defendant
Love Car Popular Stores Store
|
|
Defendant
Luckiness Store
|
|
Defendant
Lx1129 Store
|
|
Defendant
MINI PANDA Store
|
|
Defendant
MOILY-Fashion Store
|
|
Defendant
MONCERS Store
|
|
Defendant
MYCAR05 Store
|
|
Defendant
Maisike Store
|
|
Defendant
Mardin Store
|
|
Defendant
Maserati Tesla Bentley Spare Parts Store
|
|
Defendant
Mealove Store
|
|
Defendant
Miko cool cool car Store
|
|
Defendant
Military Store
|
|
Defendant
Moc Toybricks Sets Store
|
|
Defendant
Model-3-Y HOME Store
|
|
Defendant
ModelY/Model3 Store
|
|
Defendant
Mondax (Guangdong) Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Mug Fun Store
|
|
Defendant
Muggest Store
|
|
Defendant
Nanjing Xiangyun International Trade Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
New Car Decoration Accessories Store
|
|
Defendant
New Trend T-shirt Store
|
|
Defendant
Nicola Autoparts Store
|
|
Defendant
Ningbo Dingjia Auto Parts Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Ningbo High-Tech Zone Fangyuan Three-Dimensional Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Ningbo Qualitrust Automotive Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Niuniu Car Accessories Store
|
|
Defendant
Otertip Store
|
|
Defendant
PECHAM Global Store
|
|
Defendant
Qi two Store
|
|
Defendant
Qingdao Yaoming Auto Parts Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Qiuhuang Well Well Well Store
|
|
Defendant
Rachela Store
|
|
Defendant
SETBRICKS MOC Store
|
|
Defendant
SMTY--five Store
|
|
Defendant
SUIDI Store
|
|
Defendant
SUITA Store
|
|
Defendant
SUITIAN Store
|
|
Defendant
Shanghai Reliance Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shantou Chaoyang Wenguang Weiqiu Toy Factory
|
|
Defendant
Shantou Zuocheng Electronic Commerce Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Heng You Feng Electronic Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Honghuichun Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Huaten Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Icar Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Jinfengchi Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Kindon Auto Technology Limited
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Kiwi Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Longtrans Chan Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Mingxianhui Information Technology Co., Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Musk Industrial Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Ninth Element Digital Technology Co., Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Qianqian Industrial Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen RYHX Plastic & Hardware Products Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen SHV Industrial Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Xiehe Innovation Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shishi Hengyuan Autopart Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shop High Quality Men s Clothing Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop110000162 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1100050138 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1100059051 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1100087087 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102152519 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102154923 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102175715 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102272323 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102297035 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102297513 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102339364 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102457201 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102498177 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102528065 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102564052 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102582167 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102589189 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102591014 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102599923 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102636558 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102641425 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102643606 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102646227 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102647645 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102648152 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102649597 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102650590 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102660109 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102660110 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102660558 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102661463 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102661466 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102661468 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102666802 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102667358 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102667790 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102684026 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102690214 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102699235 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102712345 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102713336 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102717084 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102717548 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102720141 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102720345 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102721118 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102723156 Store
|
|
Plaintiff
Tesla, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, January 13, 2025 | ||
56 | 56
![]() FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Tesla, Inc. against The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A, PERMANENT INJUNCTION Closing Case. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 1/13/2025. See attached document for full details. (drz) |
|
55 | 55
![]() ORDER granting47 Motion for Entry of Final Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 1/13/2025. See attached document for full details. (drz) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
54 | 54
![]() ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re53 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Tesla, Inc.,50 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 1/13/2025. See attached document for full details. (drz) |