Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:James D Cain, Jr
Referred: Thomas P Leblanc
Case #: 2:24-cv-00456
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 01, 2024 3:23 AM CDT
Defendant
Cordero Pennington
Represented By
Casey T Wallace
Wallace & Allen
contact info
Benjamin W Allen
Wallace & Allen
contact info
Robert Henry Ford
Bradley Arant Et Al (hou)
contact info
Defendant
R C I Dining Services Sulphur Inc
Represented By
Casey T Wallace
Wallace & Allen
contact info
Benjamin W Allen
Wallace & Allen
contact info
Robert Henry Ford
Bradley Arant Et Al (hou)
contact info
Defendant
Travis R Reese
Represented By
Casey T Wallace
Wallace & Allen
contact info
Benjamin W Allen
Wallace & Allen
contact info
Robert Henry Ford
Bradley Arant Et Al (hou)
contact info
Plaintiff
Holly Matlock
Represented By
Leigh S Montgomery
Ellzey & Associates
contact info
Jarrett L Ellzey
Ellzey & Associates
contact info
David Harmon Hanchey
Townsley Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Detyscha Pickney
Represented By
Leigh S Montgomery
Ellzey & Associates
contact info
Jarrett L Ellzey
Ellzey & Associates
contact info
David Harmon Hanchey
Townsley Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Stacie Houston
Represented By
Leigh S Montgomery
Ellzey & Associates
contact info
Jarrett L Ellzey
Ellzey & Associates
contact info
David Harmon Hanchey
Townsley Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, January 02, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/02 1:15 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Avery Leigh Larson for Cordero Pennington,Avery Leigh Larson for R C I Dining Services Sulphur Inc,Avery Leigh Larson for Travis R Reese. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 1/2/2025. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
22 22 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/30 2:41 PM
MOTION for Avery L. Larson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-6150277) by All Defendants. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/30/2024.(aty,Ford, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed order
Monday, October 07, 2024
21 21 order Scheduling Order - Cain/LeBlanc Mon 10/07 1:41 PM
ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER Governing Pretrial Procedure: Jury Trial set for 10/20/2025 09:00 AM in Lake Charles, Courtroom 4 before Judge James D Cain Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2025 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge James D Cain Jr. Magistrate Judge Status Conference set for 7/28/2025 11:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 6/23/2025. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 7/7/2025. Amended Pleadings due by 6/23/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 7/22/2025. Daubert Motions due by 8/21/2025. Motions in Limine due by 8/21/2025. Compel discovery 8/21/2025. Deadline for filing motion for protective order is 9/22/2025. Pretrial statements due by 9/22/2025. Jury Charges/Verdict Form due by 10/6/2025. Electronic Exhibits due by 10/14/2025. Real Time glossary due by 10/14/2025. See attached Scheduling Order Addendum for additional pertinent information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 10/7/2024. (jud,LeBlanc, Thomas P)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
20 20 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 10/03 10:12 AM
MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc: A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE was held on 10/3/2024. Participating by telephone were: Leigh S. Montgomery and David Harmon Hanchey for plaintiffs and Casey T. Wallace for defendants. A Jury Trial is set for 10/20/2025 at 09:00 AM in Lake Charles, Courtroom 4 before Judge James D Cain Jr. A Pretrial Conference is set for 9/30/2025 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge James D Cain Jr. A Magistrate Judge Status Conference is set for 7/28/2025 at 11:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. Counsel are to call into the Chambers Teleconference Line at 877-336-1274, Access Code 7066014, to participate in the MJSC. See separately docketed Scheduling Order and document linked thereto for additional deadlines and explanations of those deadlines. (jud,LeBlanc, Thomas P)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/27 10:26 AM
NOTICE by Holly Matlock, Detyscha Pickney Plaintiffs' First Notice of Consent to Join(aty,Montgomery, Leigh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join
Thursday, September 26, 2024
18 18 misc Rule 26(f) Report Thu 09/26 9:48 PM
Joint RULE 26(f) Report by Holly Matlock, Detyscha Pickney . (aty,Montgomery, Leigh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 07/25 8:41 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Casey T Wallace for Cordero Pennington, R C I Dining Services Sulphur Inc, Travis R Reese. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 7/24/2024. (crt,Jones, P)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 07/25 8:38 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Benjamin W Allen for Cordero Pennington, R C I Dining Services Sulphur Inc, Travis R Reese. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 7/24/2024. (crt,Jones, P)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference Tue 07/23 1:51 PM
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2024 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. (Attachment: #1 Attachment to scheduling conference order)(crt,Stewart, T)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 06/04 11:33 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Leith S Montgomery for Holly Matlock,Leith S Montgomery for Detyscha Pickney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 6/3/2024. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 06/04 11:28 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Jarrett L Ellzey for Holly Matlock,Jarrett L Ellzey for Detyscha Pickney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 6/3/2024. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/20 10:51 AM
MOTION for Casey T. Wallace to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5948718) by All Defendants. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/20/2024.(aty,Ford, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of good standing,
Att: 2 Proposed order
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/20 10:47 AM
MOTION for Benjamin W. Allen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5948684) by Cordero Pennington, R C I Dining Services Sulphur Inc, Travis R Reese. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/20/2024.(aty,Ford, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of good standing,
Att: 2 Proposed order
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 05/20 10:37 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by R C I Dining Services Sulphur Inc. (aty,Ford, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Mon 05/06 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Robert Henry Ford on behalf of R C I Dining Services Sulphur Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/20/2024. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
8 8 10 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/06 1:51 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Cordero Pennington, R C I Dining Services Sulphur Inc, Travis R Reese.(Attorney Robert Henry Ford added to party Cordero Pennington(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Henry Ford added to party R C I Dining Services Sulphur Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Henry Ford added to party Travis R Reese(pty:dft))(aty,Ford, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/18 11:08 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Holly Matlock, Detyscha Pickney. Travis R Reese served on 4/15/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (aty,Hanchey, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/17 5:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Holly Matlock, Detyscha Pickney. Cordero Pennington served on 4/13/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (aty,Hanchey, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/17 5:12 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Holly Matlock, Detyscha Pickney. R C I Dining Services Sulphur Inc served on 4/13/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (aty,Hanchey, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/10 2:43 PM
MOTION for Leigh S. Montgomery to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5912398) by Holly Matlock, Detyscha Pickney. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/10/2024.(aty,Hanchey, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of good standing,
Att: 2 Proposed order
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/10 2:39 PM
MOTION for Jarrett L. Ellzey to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5912391) by Holly Matlock, Detyscha Pickney. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/10/2024.(aty,Hanchey, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of good standing,
Att: 2 Proposed order
Monday, April 08, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued - All (Form Included) Mon 04/08 12:09 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cordero Pennington, R C I Dining Services Sulphur Inc, Travis R Reese. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/08 12:07 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/04 2:22 PM
COMPLAINT against Cordero Pennington, RCI Dining Services (Sulphur), Inc. D/B/A Scarlett's Cabaret, Travis R. Reese (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-5905384) filed by Holly Matlock, Detyscha Pickney.(Attorney David Harmon Hanchey added to party Holly Matlock(pty:pla), Attorney David Harmon Hanchey added to party Detyscha Pickney(pty:pla))(aty,Hanchey, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet