Minnesota District Court
Judge:Katherine M Menendez
Referred: Leo I Brisbois
Case #: 0:24-cv-01163
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12181 Americans with Disabilities Act - Private Entities Definitions
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2024
Terminated:Jul 18, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 01, 2024 3:26 AM CDT
Defendant
JR Bloomington LLC
Represented By
R Henry Pfutzenreuter
Larkin Hoffman Daly & Lindgren Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Gary Scherer
Represented By
Chad Throndset
Throndset Michenfelder, LLC
contact info
Patrick W Michenfelder
Throndset Michenfelder Law Office, LLC
contact info
Jason D Gustafson
Throndset & Michenfelder Law Office LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, July 18, 2024
11 11 order Order Dismissing Case Thu 07/18 9:29 AM
(Text-Only) ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Pursuant to the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed on July 17, 2024 (ECF 9), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice and on the merits and without costs, disbursements, or attorneys' fees to any party. Ordered by Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/18/2024. (SDV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
10 10 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Wed 07/17 11:25 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re9 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Gustafson, Jason)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 07/17 11:24 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Gary Scherer. (Gustafson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 06/28 10:59 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by JR Bloomington LLC (Pfutzenreuter, R)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 04/24 11:00 AM
ORDER on5 Stipulation. JR Bloomington LLC answer due 6/28/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 4/24/2024.(JLB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
6 6 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Tue 04/23 1:14 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re5 Stipulation. (Pfutzenreuter, R)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Stipulation Tue 04/23 1:11 PM
STIPULATION (Joint) by JR Bloomington LLC. Jointly Signed by Gary Scherer and JR Bloomington LLC d/b/a Quality Inn & Suites Mall of America - MSP Airport. (Pfutzenreuter, R)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/09 9:13 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gary Scherer. JR Bloomington LLC served on 4/8/2024, answer due 4/29/2024. (Michenfelder, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 04/05 9:12 AM
Summons Issued as to JR Bloomington LLC. (LTT)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Fri 04/05 9:11 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Katherine M. Menendez per 6th Civil Rights - Housing/Accomodations & ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 24-cv-1163 KMM/LIB. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (LTT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/04 3:29 PM
COMPLAINT against JR Bloomington LLC (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-10952920) filed by Gary Scherer. Filer requests summons issued. (Throndset, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet