Jewish Child Care Association of New York d/b/a JCCA v. Fulgenzi et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Philip M Halpern |
Case #: | 7:24-cv-02580 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1981 Equal Rights Under the Law |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 04, 2024 6:08 PM EDT |
Defendant
Carl Fulgenzi
|
|
Defendant
Town of Mount Pleasant
|
|
Plaintiff
Jewish Child Care Association of New York d/b/a JCCA
57 Willoughby Street
Brooklyn, NY 11201 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Thu 04/25 10:53 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Carl Fulgenzi served on 4/8/2024, answer due 4/29/2024. Service was accepted by Carl Fulgenzi, Town Supervisor. Document filed by Jewish Child Care Association of New York d/b/a JCCA..(Vogel, Cassandra) |
|
10 | 10
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Thu 04/25 10:51 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Town of Mount Pleasant served on 4/8/2024, answer due 4/29/2024. Service was accepted by Carl Fulgenzi, Town Supervisor. Document filed by Jewish Child Care Association of New York d/b/a JCCA..(Vogel, Cassandra) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
utility
Case Declined as Not Related
Tue 04/09 2:02 PM
CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 7:23-cv-03954-NSR-VR and declined by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman and returned to wheel for assignment. (tro) |
||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Tue 04/09 2:04 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (tro) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 04/09 2:06 PM
Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (tro) |
||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/05 3:20 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Carl Fulgenzi..(pc) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/05 3:19 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Town of Mount Pleasant..(pc) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 04/05 1:46 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/05 1:46 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
utility
Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
Fri 04/05 1:47 PM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Nelson Stephen Roman as possibly related to 23cv3954 (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Fri 04/05 1:47 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Benjamin R. Allee. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Carl Fulgenzi. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Fri 04/05 1:47 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Benjamin R. Allee. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Westchester; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Kings; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc) |
||
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/04 7:01 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Carl Fulgenzi, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jewish Child Care Association of New York d/b/a JCCA..(Vogel, Cassandra) |
|
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/04 6:48 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Town of Mount Pleasant, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jewish Child Care Association of New York d/b/a JCCA..(Vogel, Cassandra) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/04 6:40 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cassandra M. Vogel on behalf of Jewish Child Care Association of New York d/b/a JCCA..(Vogel, Cassandra) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/04 5:58 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Jewish Child Care Association of New York d/b/a JCCA..(Allee, Benjamin) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Statement of Relatedness
Thu 04/04 5:57 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 23 Civ. 3954 (NSR). Document filed by Jewish Child Care Association of New York d/b/a JCCA..(Allee, Benjamin) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/04 5:53 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Allee, Benjamin) |
|
1 | 1
16
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/04 5:51 PM
COMPLAINT against Carl Fulgenzi, Town of Mount Pleasant. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29177713)Document filed by Jewish Child Care Association of New York d/b/a JCCA..(Allee, Benjamin) |