Rhode Island District Court
Judge:William E Smith
Referred: Patricia A Sullivan
Case #: 1:24-cv-00127
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2024
Terminated:Mar 28, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 01, 2024 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant
Merrick B. Garland
Represented By
Kevin Bolan
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
United States Department of Justice
Represented By
Kevin Bolan
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
United States Drug Enforcement Administration
Represented By
Kevin Bolan
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Kevin Bolan
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
Anne Milgram
Represented By
Kevin Bolan
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
Teresa Wallbaum
Represented By
Kevin Bolan
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
MMJ Biopharma Cultivation, Inc.
Represented By
Megan E. Sheehan
Sheehan & Associates Law
contact info

GPO Mar 28 2025
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. So Ordered by Senior District Judge William E Smith on 3/28/2025. (Simoncelli, Michael)
GPO Apr 23 2025
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 25 Motion for Reconsideration. So Ordered by Senior Judge William E Smith on 4/23/2025. (Simoncelli, Michael)

Docket last updated: 39 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
27 27 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Wed 04/23 10:26 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying25 Motion for Reconsideration. So Ordered by Senior Judge William E Smith on 4/23/2025. (Simoncelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
26 26 respm Response to Motion Fri 04/11 11:31 AM
RESPONSE In Opposition to25 First MOTION for Reconsideration filed by All Defendants. Replies due by 4/18/2025. (Bolan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
25 25 motion Reconsideration Thu 04/03 11:28 AM
First MOTION for Reconsideration filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 4/17/2025. (Sheehan, Megan)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
24 24 order Judgment Fri 03/28 1:40 PM
JUDGMENT. So Ordered by Clerk of Court on 3/28/2025. (Simoncelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
23 23 8 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim Fri 03/28 1:38 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. So Ordered by Senior District Judge William E Smith on 3/28/2025. (Simoncelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/27 9:57 AM
NOTICE by Merrick B. Garland, United States Department of Justice, United States Drug Enforcement Administration, Anne Milgram, Teresa Wallbaum, United States of America re16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , or in the alternative, for Summary Judgment Notice of Change in Position (Bolan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
21 21 respm Reply to Response Fri 12/13 3:15 PM
REPLY to Response re20 Response to Motion, filed by All Defendants. (Bolan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
20 20 respm Response to Motion Wed 11/20 4:15 PM
First RESPONSE In Opposition to16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , or in the alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by MMJ Biopharma Cultivation, Inc.. Replies due by 11/27/2024. (Sheehan, Megan)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 11/01 3:45 PM
TEXT ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Reset deadlines as to16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: Responses due by 11/20/2024; Replies due by 12/13/2024. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 11/1/2024. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 10/23 9:06 AM
Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , or in the alternative, for Summary Judgment , Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,17 Statement of Undisputed Facts, filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 11/6/2024. (Bolan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 10/08 12:41 PM
TEXT ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re16 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 10/23/2024; Replies due by 11/15/2024. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 10/8/2024. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 10/07 10:48 AM
Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply extending deadlines for both Response and Reply relating to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss/Motion for Summary Judgment filed by MMJ Biopharma Cultivation, Inc.. Responses due by 10/21/2024. (Sheehan, Megan)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
17 17 misc Statement of Undisputed Facts Mon 09/09 3:12 PM
STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS by All Defendants re16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , or in the alternative, for Summary Judgment .(Bolan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Rosario Declaration and Accompanying Exhibits
16 16 motion Dismiss for failure to State a Claim Mon 09/09 3:04 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , or in the alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 9/23/2024. (Bolan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
15 15 19 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Tue 08/13 1:05 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Merrick B. Garland, Anne Milgram, United States Department of Justice, United States Drug Enforcement Administration, United States of America, Teresa Wallbaum, filed by MMJ Biopharma Cultivation, Inc. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 08/13 12:51 PM
TEXT ORDER granting13 Joint Motion for Extension of Time and Plaintiff's14 Motion to Amend Complaint as unopposed. Defendants consent to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend, and the parties agree to a briefing schedule for moving under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12 on the amended pleadings. The clerk's office is directed to set the deadlines in the13 Joint Motion for Extension of Time and to docket the Amended Complaint. See PXA, First Am. Compl., ECF No. 14. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 8/13/2024. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 08/13 1:11 PM
Reset Deadlines: Responsive pleading to amended complaint due by 9/9/2024; Responses due by 10/9/2024; Replies due by 11/1/2024. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
14 14 44 pgs motion Amend/Correct Mon 08/12 3:21 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint filed by MMJ Biopharma Cultivation, Inc.. Responses due by 8/26/2024. (Sheehan, Megan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
13 13 2 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 08/08 9:37 AM
Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Rule 12 Briefing filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 8/22/2024. (Bolan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
12 12 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/18 11:33 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Bolan on behalf of All Defendants (Bolan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 07/09 2:22 PM
TEXT ORDER finding as moot10 Motion for Extension of Time. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 7/9/2024. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 07/09 2:27 PM
Set Deadlines: Merrick B. Garland answer due 8/23/2024; Anne Milgram answer due 8/23/2024; United States Department of Justice answer due 8/23/2024; United States Drug Enforcement Administration answer due 8/23/2024; United States of America answer due 8/23/2024; Teresa Wallbaum answer due 8/23/2024. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 07/03 12:35 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by MMJ Biopharma Cultivation, Inc.. All Defendants.(Sheehan, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Return Receipt Executed - DOJ,
Att: 2 Return Receipt Executed - RI,
Att: 3 Return Receipt Executed - Garland,
Att: 4 Return Receipt Executed - Milgram,
Att: 5 Return Receipt Executed - Wallbaum
Thursday, June 27, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time Thu 06/27 7:52 PM
MOTION for an Extension of Time requesting 30-day extension to complete service of process on all Defendants filed by MMJ Biopharma Cultivation, Inc.. Responses due by 7/11/2024. (Sheehan, Megan)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued as to USA Fri 06/21 9:13 AM
Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
8 8 service Summons Request Thu 06/20 7:41 PM
Summons Request filed by MMJ Biopharma Cultivation, Inc.. (Sheehan, Megan)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Request Thu 06/20 2:55 PM
Summons Request filed by MMJ Biopharma Cultivation, Inc.. (Sheehan, Megan)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued as to USA Thu 06/20 2:25 PM
Summons Issued as to Merrick B. Garland, United States Department of Justice, United States Drug Enforcement Administration, U.S. Attorney General(Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 06/20 2:23 PM
Summons Issued as to Anne Milgram, Teresa Wallbaum.(Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
4 4 service Summons Request Thu 06/20 10:25 AM
Summons Request filed by MMJ Biopharma Cultivation, Inc..(Sheehan, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Request,
Att: 2 Summons Request,
Att: 3 Summons Request,
Att: 4 Summons Request
Friday, April 05, 2024
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 04/05 11:01 AM
Civil Cover Sheet filed by MMJ Biopharma Cultivation, Inc.. Regarding New Case: Corrective Docket Entry, . (Sheehan, Megan)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Case Opening Notice (Form Attached) Fri 04/05 9:24 AM
CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
misc Corrective Docket Entry Fri 04/05 9:11 AM
CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding:1 Complaint. This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 04/05 9:23 AM
Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint - New Case Thu 04/04 5:31 PM
COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 405.00, receipt number ARIDC-1980593 ), filed by MMJ Biopharma Cultivation, Inc..(Sheehan, Megan)
Related: [-]