8
|
|
8
order
Judgment
Wed 04/24 4:39 PM
JUDGMENT. So Ordered by Clerk of Court on 4/24/2024. (Simoncelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
order
Order
Wed 04/24 4:37 PM
TEXT ORDER: After reviewing the Plaintiff's response to this Court's Show Cause Order, it is clear to the Court that it does not have subject matter jurisdiction and therefore this matter must be dismissed. The Plaintiff has not adequately and plausibly alleged either diversity or federal question jurisdiction, therefore this case cannot proceed in this court. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 4/24/2024. (Simoncelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/22 12:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Thompson. Brian Lamoureux served on 4/15/2024, answer due 5/6/2024.(Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Email
|
6
|
|
6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 04/19 1:24 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Thompson. CREB Engineering served on 4/11/2024, answer due 5/2/2024; Patrick McBurney served on 4/11/2024, answer due 5/2/2024; Steven Robinson served on 4/11/2024, answer due 5/2/2024; Jerame Sadowski served on 4/11/2024, answer due 5/2/2024. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Summons Returned as to CREB Engineering,
|
| |
Att: 2
Summons Returned as to Robinson,
|
| |
Att: 3
Summons Returned as to McBurney,
|
| |
Att: 4
Notice,
|
| |
Att: 5
Email
|
5
|
|
5
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Mon 04/15 3:40 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Thomas Thompson.(Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Email
|
|
|
order
Order to Show Cause (Form Attached)
Fri 04/05 9:10 AM
TEXT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff must show cause within 10 days why this matter should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Plaintiff alleges it is based on diversity jurisdiction, but there is no plausible allegation that the case in controversy exceeds $75,000. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 4/5/2024. (Simoncelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/04 4:27 PM
Summons Issued as to CREB Engineering, CREB Engines, Inc., Amir Heidari, Brian Lamoureux, Patrick McBurney, Steven Robinson, Jerame Sadowski. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Summons Issued as to CREB Engineering,
|
| |
Att: 2
Summons Issued as to Heidari,
|
| |
Att: 3
Summons Issued as to CREB Engines, Inc.,
|
| |
Att: 4
Summons Issued as to Robinson,
|
| |
Att: 5
Summons Issued as to McBurney,
|
| |
Att: 6
Summons Issued as to Lamoureux
|
3
|
|
3
notice
Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)
Thu 04/04 4:24 PM
CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
service
Summons Request
Thu 04/04 4:07 PM
Summons Requests filed by Thomas Thompson. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Summons Request as to CREB Engineering,
|
| |
Att: 2
Summons Request as to Heidari,
|
| |
Att: 3
Summons Request as to CREB Engines, Inc.,
|
| |
Att: 4
Summons Request as to Robinson,
|
| |
Att: 5
Summons Request as to McBurney,
|
| |
Att: 6
Summons Request as to Lamoureux
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/04 3:54 PM
COMPLAINT (filing fee paid $405.00 receipt number 100001249), filed by Thomas Thompson. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit C,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit D,
|
| |
Att: 5
Exhibit E,
|
| |
Att: 6
Exhibit F,
|
| |
Att: 7
Exhibit G,
|
| |
Att: 8
Exhibit H,
|
| |
Att: 9
Affidavit,
|
| |
Att: 10
Civil Cover Sheet,
|
| |
Att: 11
Proposed Order
|
|
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/04 4:24 PM
Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
Related: [-]
|