Doe v. Hyatt Hotels, Corp dba Hyatt Hotels and Resorts et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Lewis J Liman |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02583 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 1:10 AM EDT |
ADR Provider
Global Hyatt
|
|
Defendant
Apple Leisure Group
|
|
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant
Hyatt Corporations
|
|
Defendant
Hyatt Hotels, Corp dba Hyatt Hotels and Resorts
|
|
Defendant
Secrets Moxche Resort & Spa
|
|
Plaintiff
John Doe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 20 minutes ago |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
Mon 04/15 11:57 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Leave to File Document. After considering the factors outlined in Sealed Plaintiff v. Sealed Defendant #1, 537 F.3d 185 (2d Cir. 2008), the Court will permit the complaint to be filed under seal subject to reconsideration after defendant has appeared and has had an opportunity to address the issue. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 4/15/2024) (va) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 04/12 11:56 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Proceed Anonymously . Document filed by John Doe..(Williams, T. Edward) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 04/05 5:09 PM
ORDER: The Complaint in this case was filed anonymously without leave of Court. Dkt. No. 1. In order to proceed anonymously, Plaintiff must make a motion to do so. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 10. If no such motion is filed by April 12, 2024, the Court will dismiss the Complaint accordingly. ( Motions due by 4/12/2024.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 4/5/2024) (ate) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/05 12:30 AM
FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Williams, T. Edward) Modified on 4/5/2024 (pc) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 04/05 2:40 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 04/05 2:40 PM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/05 2:41 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Fri 04/05 2:41 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney T. Edward Williams. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: John Doe, Secrets Moxche Resort & Spa, Global Hyatt, Apple Leisure Group. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/05 2:41 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney T. Edward Williams to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): multiple citizenships for the defendant were selected. Choose one for the first listed defendant;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (pc) |
||
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/04 6:45 PM
COMPLAINT against Apple Leisure Group, John Doe, Global Hyatt, Hyatt Corporations, Hyatt Hotels, Corp dba Hyatt Hotels and Resorts, Secrets Moxche Resort & Spa. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29177963)Document filed by John Doe..(Williams, T. Edward) |