C.O. v. New York City Department of Education et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Katherine Polk Failla |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02584 |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Cause | 20:1400 IDEA: Individuals With Disabilities Education Act (short title) |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 1:11 AM EDT |
Defendant
Chancellor David Banks
|
|
Defendant
New York City Department of Education
|
|
Defendant
The Board of Education of the City School District of the City of New York
|
|
Defendant
The City of New York
|
|
Plaintiff
C.O.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Mon 04/08 12:34 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Chancellor David Banks served on 4/8/2024, answer due 4/29/2024; City Of New York served on 4/8/2024, answer due 4/29/2024; New York City Department of Education served on 4/8/2024, answer due 4/29/2024; The Board of Education of the City School District of the City of New York served on 4/8/2024, answer due 4/29/2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by C.O...(Apter-Vidler, Nicolas) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/05 3:22 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chancellor David Banks, City Of New York, New York City Department of Education, The Board of Education of the City School District of the City of New York..(pc) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 04/05 2:49 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 04/05 2:50 PM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/05 2:50 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/04 8:23 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Apter-Vidler, Nicolas) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/04 8:22 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education; The Board of Education of the City School District of the City of New York; Chancellor David Banks, in his Official Capacity; The City of New York, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by C.O...(Apter-Vidler, Nicolas) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Rider | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/04 8:21 PM
COMPLAINT against Chancellor David Banks, New York City Department of Education, The Board of Education of the City School District of the City of New York, The City of New York. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29178121)Document filed by C.O...(Apter-Vidler, Nicolas) |