Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Eleanor L Ross
Case #: 1:24-cv-00992
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause28:1338 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2024
Terminated:Feb 05, 2025
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant
xuankui568568
Defendant
wystore
Defendant
xbrjerseys
Defendant
xcliang
Defendant
xdstarjersey
Defendant
xh_jerseys
Defendant
xia_jersey168
Defendant
xianglanshangmao
Defendant
xianyouxianbangtouchenzifeijiajuweixiudian
Defendant
xianyouxianlonghuachenhonggongyipinshanghang
Defendant
wuqiliang5618
Defendant
yangxinstore
Defendant
yiyunsports166
Defendant
yourarticles01
Defendant
yunkuo-93
Defendant
zengduquanlingbaihuodian
Defendant
zxc503
Defendant
zyx05200
Defendant
ALOTS
Represented By
Albert M. Myers
Albert M. Myers
contact info
Defendant
LUYAN ART
Represented By
Albert M. Myers
Albert M. Myers
contact info
Defendant
vi22ctorystore
Defendant
tongbao2022
Defendant
top quality jersey
Defendant
topjersey1111
Defendant
topjersey1998
Defendant
topsoccersport
Defendant
toysweethome
Defendant
tubasport
Defendant
ujkas88
Defendant
ustarjersey
Defendant
tomato_2023
Defendant
wangruixue
Defendant
wholesalejerseys2022
Defendant
willfun1001
Defendant
wjxzjj88888
Defendant
woaiaobama555
Defendant
wona_4733
Defendant
wr123456789
Defendant
wsr888888
Defendant
22/23 soccer jersey
Defendant
788qa92
Defendant
ALLWIST
Defendant
All star Jersey
Defendant
Ccm Stitched Jersey
Defendant
CelebsApparel
Defendant
Champion Star
Defendant
ChenSport
Defendant
ChengShunArtPrint
Defendant
Dxia shirts
Defendant
Fans New Jersey
Defendant
Football Jersey
Defendant
Football Rugby Jerseys
Defendant
Football Sportswear 901
Defendant
Football Tracksuit
Defendant
GeYuJie
Defendant
HO Soccer Jersey
Defendant
Huniuniu
Defendant
Jersey Shops 01
Defendant
Lamden Night Light Store
Defendant
LeatherArtistics
Defendant
MakeBest
Defendant
Mzk Stitched Jersey
Defendant
NASA Jersey
Defendant
Nba jerseys
Defendant
New Football Jersey
Defendant
Newale
Defendant
Qarina Qarina
Defendant
QingGengGuangZhouShangMaoYouXianGongSi
Defendant
Rambugn
Defendant
Rashid Mehmood
Defendant
Retro jerseys Classic shirt
Defendant
Saad Sadiq
Defendant
Zain Ahmed Shafi
Defendant
ShazhuimixMb
Defendant
Shellyzhs
Defendant
Soccer jersey777777
Defendant
Soccerjerseys8888
Defendant
Sports jerseys168
Defendant
TOP SELLER JERSEY
Defendant
TheJacketMerchant
Defendant
US Leather Mart
Defendant
a_starstitchedjersey
Defendant
aaa99901
Defendant
aaaa13929533602
Defendant
advancedjersey
Defendant
ajshoes6688
Defendant
alice888999
Defendant
anshe35
Defendant
arwee39
Defendant
ava2024
Defendant
babynice111
Defendant
bellingham5jersey
Defendant
bestsoccerjerseys
Defendant
bigsellers886
Defendant
ccjersey
Defendant
cfeng4718325
Defendant
chen1355
Defendant
chengduxiannieheshangmaoyouxiangongsi
Defendant
chenshop6
Defendant
cheryl1223
Defendant
clarance armstrong
Defendant
cr7jersey tracksuit
Defendant
crownjersey
Defendant
cyexefldy
Defendant
ddm0011
Defendant
ddm0022
Defendant
ddm0033
Defendant
dear3333jersey
Defendant
dengya123
Defendant
designer168clothing
Defendant
dh_jersey
Defendant
dhgatea1
Defendant
dhgatea2
Defendant
dhgatea6
Defendant
dhjersey888
Defendant
discount2022
Defendant
eecoke
Defendant
effectsports
Defendant
elitesport
Defendant
european jersey99999
Defendant
excellentjersey168
Defendant
fangmuwa23
Defendant
fcjersey
Defendant
featuredjersey
Defendant
football jersey 2016
Defendant
football jersey 2024
Defendant
football jersey 2025
Defendant
football_2023
Defendant
football_jersey_2023
Defendant
ggg12345678
Defendant
golf shoes
Defendant
goodbuysporty
Defendant
goodluck003
Defendant
goodmami
Defendant
great_jersey_store
Defendant
gzjjgc
Defendant
hecn829
Defendant
hehe fashion
Defendant
hemu1986
Defendant
hezhiqiang-333
Defendant
hjerseys
Defendant
hot012
Defendant
hot_new_store
Defendant
hotman63
Defendant
i love jerseys
Defendant
jamesstitchedjersey
Defendant
jaylu
Defendant
jersey 2023
Defendant
jersey1681688
Defendant
jersey1933
Defendant
jersey2024
Defendant
jersey2030
Defendant
jersey2031
Defendant
jersey66666
Defendant
jersey7866
Defendant
jersey9986
Defendant
jersey_argentina1
Defendant
jersey_world888
Defendant
jerseyasd11
Defendant
jerseybuy1take2
Defendant
jerseyedge1
Defendant
jerseymlb11
Defendant
jerseyqwe11
Defendant
jerseys2038
Defendant
jerseys_sport
Defendant
jerseyshop02
Defendant
jerseytopone
Defendant
jiang18826
Defendant
jinmansports
Defendant
jyfootball Store
Defendant
kimi50
Defendant
kimi55
Defendant
kun384643
Defendant
lc1dadian
Defendant
lester6620
Defendant
liang6688
Defendant
lin388
Defendant
linfootball1122
Defendant
lipanpan1134
Defendant
loctjersey
Defendant
lzyjersey
Defendant
mahongjuan fashion
Defendant
manglian
Defendant
manutd999
Defendant
maomaojin
Defendant
meiteng_95
Defendant
messi2026
Defendant
messi_jersey11
Defendant
messidona
Defendant
messijersey10
Defendant
mimosa-88
Defendant
mlbvip6
Defendant
mrfootball30
Defendant
n1soccer
Defendant
narcissus25
Defendant
new top jerseys
Defendant
new2022sale
Defendant
nfljersey188001
Defendant
nfljersey188002
Defendant
niuwenzhi1
Defendant
nnbbllssjersey5200
Defendant
not404findstore
Defendant
nrl rugby league jerseys 2019
Defendant
pepe sportswear
Defendant
psg6689
Defendant
psgmessi2022
Defendant
putianshichengxiangqupanjunjiemaoyiyouxiangongsi
Defendant
putianshilichengquchengmujinmaoyiyouxiangongsi
Defendant
qualityjersey2024
Defendant
real1jerseys
Defendant
real2jerseys
Defendant
realjersey
Defendant
retro jerseys
Defendant
retro688
Defendant
retroes
Defendant
rgsyf22
Defendant
robess2026
Defendant
rui666888
Defendant
s3533
Defendant
s3599
Defendant
sbnation
Defendant
scoresport
Defendant
sdsdsdfbvsd
Defendant
seller8931
Defendant
shua1318
Defendant
shunshun0517
Defendant
soccer Jersey
Defendant
soccer jersey 778
Defendant
soccer kit
Defendant
soccer1355jersey
Defendant
soccer1878
Defendant
soccer1933
Defendant
soccer_jersey8
Defendant
soccer_shirt
Defendant
soccerjersey188 supplier
Defendant
soccerjersey2023
Defendant
soccerjersey88888
Defendant
soccerjersey99999
Defendant
soccerjerseys009
Defendant
soccerjerseys2024
Defendant
soccerwear_vip
Defendant
sportingspace
Defendant
sports2324
Defendant
sportsjersey111
Defendant
sportsshirt5031
Defendant
springsports
Defendant
stephen_curry
Defendant
stockjersey
Defendant
tanpeipei1134
Defendant
telanpu
Defendant
theamericabusiness
Defendant
thumbsports
Plaintiff
DB Ventures Limited
Represented By
Carrie A. Hanlon
The Sladkus Law Group
contact info
Abbie Alexis Cook
The Sladkus Law Group
contact info
Jason Harris Cooper
The Sladkus Law Group
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
xiangwyan_0
Terminated: 05/07/2024
Defendant
wadeggr62
Terminated: 05/07/2024
Defendant
7295857
Terminated: 05/14/2024
Defendant
Aikhan Sagynbekov
Terminated: 04/25/2024
Defendant
AlexGear
Terminated: 05/14/2024
Defendant
DOGUS SAGLAM
Terminated: 04/15/2024
Defendant
ERIK EGIAZARYAN
Terminated: 04/24/2024
Defendant
LD E-COM LLC
Terminated: 05/07/2024
Defendant
Le Duc Viet
Terminated: 04/15/2024
Defendant
Ronaldo jersey
Terminated: 07/01/2024
Defendant
Shanghai Youyu Trading Co., Ltd.
Terminated: 04/25/2024
Defendant
ShenZhenShiYiShengGuoJiMaoYiYouXianGongSi
Terminated: 05/21/2024
Defendant
a9bamboo
Terminated: 05/14/2024
Defendant
arieser
Terminated: 05/14/2024
Defendant
bigfiguresseller
Terminated: 05/07/2024
Defendant
bohuaitrading
Terminated: 05/07/2024
Defendant
cardhome
Terminated: 04/09/2024
Defendant
cl-net
Terminated: 04/15/2024
Defendant
cute_babby
Terminated: 04/25/2024
Defendant
fastbuyon
Terminated: 05/07/2024
Defendant
feilaystc
Terminated: 04/09/2024
Defendant
fightingqueentoy
Terminated: 05/14/2024
Defendant
fouroceans_sport
Terminated: 06/24/2024
Defendant
globalheadphonestore
Terminated: 07/22/2024
Defendant
handbag6668886
Terminated: 07/01/2024
Defendant
happy_susu
Terminated: 05/07/2024
Defendant
hot_trends07
Terminated: 04/16/2024
Defendant
jerseycr7
Terminated: 07/01/2024
Defendant
kingkong8861
Terminated: 04/25/2024
Defendant
mny19-53
Terminated: 05/07/2024
Defendant
nywk-83
Terminated: 05/07/2024
Defendant
nywybest
Terminated: 04/15/2024
Defendant
pzbiglcc
Terminated: 06/17/2024
Defendant
shenzhenshiluyanguojimaoyiyouxiangongsi
Terminated: 05/21/2024
Defendant
soldier_top2020
Terminated: 05/07/2024
Defendant
sxdf32
Terminated: 05/07/2024
Defendant
taode4
Terminated: 05/07/2024


Docket last updated: 22 minutes ago
Thursday, February 06, 2025
41 41 misc A.O. Form 120 Thu 02/06 10:20 AM
AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (ajw)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/06 10:17 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re40 Order on Motion for Default Judgment to Ebay, Amazon.com, Inc., ContextLogic Inc. and eBay Inc. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
40 40 21 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Thu 02/06 9:51 AM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 02/05/2025. (ajw)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 02/06 10:20 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Tue 01/14 10:06 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING38 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to 22/23 soccer jersey; aaa99901; ChenSport; cr7jersey tracksuit; dhjersey888; Dxia shirts; Effectsports; european jersey99999; excellentjersey168; football jersey 2016; football_2023; i love jerseys; jaylu; jersey66666; jerseybuy1take2; jerseys2038; jerseytopone; kimi55; lzyjersey; maomaojin; new top jerseys; realjersey; scoresport; Shellyzhs; shunshun0517; soccer_jersey8; soccer_shirt; soccerjerseys009; soccerjerseys2024; sportingspace; top quality jersey; xbrjerseys yiyunsports166; and zxc503 only. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
39 39 motion Default Judgment Mon 01/13 9:19 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to 788qa92; a_starstitchedjersey; aaaa13929533602; advancedjersey; ajshoes6688; alice888999; All star Jersey; ALLWIST; anshe35; arwee39; ava2024; babynice111; bellingham5jersey; bestsoccerjerseys; bigsellers886; ccjersey; Ccm Stitched Jersey; CelebsApparel; cfeng4718325; Champion Star; chengduxiannieheshangmaoyouxiangongsi; ChengShunArtPrint; chenshop6; cheryl1223; clarance armstrong; crownjersey; cyexefldy; ddm0011; ddm0022; ddm0033; dear3333jersey; dengya123; designer168clothing; dh_jersey; dhgatea1; dhgatea2; dhgatea6; discount2022; eecoke; elitesport; fangmuwa23; Fans New Jersey; fcjersey; featuredjersey; Football Jersey; football jersey 2024; football jersey 2025; Football Rugby Jerseys; Football Sportswear 901; Football Tracksuit; football_jersey_2023; GeYuJie; ggg12345678; golf shoes; goodbuysporty; goodluck003; goodmami; great_jersey_store; gzjjgc; hecn829; hehe fashion; hjerseys; HO Soccer Jersey; hot_new_store; hot012; hotman63; Huniuniu; jamesstitchedjersey; jersey 2023; Jersey Shops 01; jersey_argentina1; jersey_world888; jersey1933; jersey2024; jersey2030; jersey2031; jersey7866; jersey9986; jersey1681688; jerseyasd11; jerseyedge1; jerseymlb11; jerseyqwe11; jerseys_sport; jerseyshop02; jiang18826; jinmansports; jyfootball Store; kimi50; kun384643; Lamden Night Light Store; lc1dadian; LeatherArtistics; lester6620; liang6688; lin388; linfootball1122; lipanpan1134; loctjersey; mahongjuan fashion; MakeBest; manglian; manutd999; meiteng_95; messi_jersey11; messi2026; messidona; messijersey10; mimosa-88; mlbvip6; mrfootball30; Mzk Stitched Jersey; n1soccer; narcissus25; NASA Jersey; Nba jerseys; New Football Jersey; new2022sale; Newale; nfljersey188001; nfljersey188002; niuwenzhi1; nnbbllssjersey5200; not404findstore; nrl rugby league jerseys 2019; pepe sportswear; psg6689; psgmessi2022; putianshichengxiangqupanjunjiemaoyiyouxiangongsi; putianshilichengquchengmujinmaoyiyouxiangongsi; Qarina Qarina; QingGengGuangZhouShangMaoYouXianGongSi; qualityjersey2024; Rambugn; Rashid Mehmood; real1jerseys; real2jerseys; retro jerseys; Retro jerseys Classic shirt; retro688; retroes; rgsyf22; robess2026; rui666888; s3533; s3599; Saad Sadiq; sbnation; sdsdsdfbvsd; seller8931; ShazhuimixMb; shua1318; soccer Jersey; soccer jersey 778; Soccer jersey777777; soccer kit; soccer1878; soccer1933; soccerjersey188 supplier; soccerjersey2023; soccerjersey88888; soccerjersey99999; Soccerjerseys8888; soccerwear_vip; Sports jerseys168; sports2324; sportsjersey111; sportsshirt5031; springsports; stephen_curry; stockjersey; tanpeipei1134; telanpu; TheJacketMerchant; thumbsports; tomato_2023; tongbao2022; TOP SELLER JERSEY; topjersey1111; topjersey1998; topsoccersport; toysweethome; tubasport; ujkas88; US Leather Mart; ustarjersey; vi22ctorystore; wangruixue; wholesalejerseys2022; willfun1001; wjxzjj88888; woaiaobama555; wona_4733; wr123456789; wsr888888; wuqiliang5618; wystore; xcliang; xdstarjersey; xh_jerseys; xia_jersey168; xianglanshangmao; xianyouxianbangtouchenzifeijiajuweixiudian; xianyouxianlonghuachenhonggongyipinshanghang; xuankui568568; yangxinstore; yourarticles01; yunkuo-93; Zain Ahmed Shafi; zengduquanlingbaihuodian; and zyx05200 with Brief In Support by DB Ventures Limited.(Hanlon, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Permanent Injunctive Relief Against Defaulting Defendants,
Att: 2 Exhibit D to Plaintiff's Memorandum,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order on Motion for Default Judgment,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction
38 38 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 01/13 5:55 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Round 14) filed by DB Ventures Limited (Hanlon, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Tue 01/07 8:49 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING37 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to chen1355, hemu1986, hezhiqiang-333, soccer1355jersey and theamericabusiness only. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
37 37 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 01/06 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Round 13) filed by DB Ventures Limited (Hanlon, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
order Order to Show Cause Fri 12/27 10:19 AM
MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only). ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court DIRECTS Plaintiffs to show cause, within thirty (30) days of this order, as to why their claims against the remaining Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to submit this case to the undersigned after expiration of the thirty (30)-day period. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 12/27/24. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Mon 07/22 8:43 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING36 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to globalheadphonestore only. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
36 36 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 07/19 9:20 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Round 12) filed by DB Ventures Limited (Cook, Abbie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
35 35 motion Clerks Entry of Default Thu 07/11 12:47 PM
MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default with Brief In Support by DB Ventures Limited.(Hanlon, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Carrie A. Hanlon
utility Clerks Entry of Default Mon 07/29 11:37 AM
Clerks Entry of Default as to 22/23 soccer jersey, 788qa92, ALLWIST, ALOTS, All star Jersey, Ccm Stitched Jersey, CelebsApparel, Champion Star, ChenSport, ChengShunArtPrint, Dxia shirts, Fans New Jersey, Football Jersey, Football Rugby Jerseys, Football Sportswear 901, Football Tracksuit, GeYuJie, HO Soccer Jersey, Huniuniu, Jersey Shops 01, LUYAN ART, Lamden Night Light Store, LeatherArtistics, MakeBest, Mzk Stitched Jersey, NASA Jersey, Nba jerseys, New Football Jersey, Newale, Qarina Qarina, QingGengGuangZhouShangMaoYouXianGongSi, Rambugn, Rashid Mehmood, Retro jerseys Classic shirt, Saad Sadiq, Zain Ahmed Shafi, ShazhuimixMb, Shellyzhs, Soccer jersey777777, Soccerjerseys8888, Sports jerseys168, TOP SELLER JERSEY, TheJacketMerchant, US Leather Mart, a_starstitchedjersey, aaa99901, aaaa13929533602, advancedjersey, ajshoes6688, alice888999, anshe35, arwee39, ava2024, babynice111, bellingham5jersey, bestsoccerjerseys, bigsellers886, ccjersey, cfeng4718325, chen1355, chengduxiannieheshangmaoyouxiangongsi, chenshop6, cheryl1223, clarance armstrong, cr7jersey tracksuit, crownjersey, cyexefldy, ddm0011, ddm0022, ddm0033, dear3333jersey, dengya123, designer168clothing, dh_jersey, dhgatea1, dhgatea2, dhgatea6, dhjersey888, discount2022, eecoke, effectsports, elitesport, european jersey99999, excellentjersey168, fangmuwa23, fcjersey, featuredjersey, football jersey 2016, football jersey 2024, football jersey 2025, football_2023, football_jersey_2023, ggg12345678, golf shoes, goodbuysporty, goodluck003, goodmami, great_jersey_store, gzjjgc, hecn829, hehe fashion, hemu1986, hezhiqiang-333, hjerseys, hot012, hot_new_store, hotman63, i love jerseys, jamesstitchedjersey, jaylu, jersey 2023, jersey1681688, jersey1933, jersey2024, jersey2030, jersey2031, jersey66666, jersey7866, jersey9986, jersey_argentina1, jersey_world888, jerseyasd11, jerseybuy1take2, jerseyedge1, jerseymlb11, jerseyqwe11, jerseys2038, jerseys_sport, jerseyshop02, jerseytopone, jiang18826, jinmansports, jyfootball Store, kimi50, kimi55, kun384643, lc1dadian, lester6620, liang6688, lin388, linfootball1122, lipanpan1134, loctjersey, lzyjersey, mahongjuan fashion, manglian, manutd999, maomaojin, meiteng_95, messi2026, messi_jersey11, messidona, messijersey10, mimosa-88, mlbvip6, mrfootball30, n1soccer, narcissus25, new top jerseys, new2022sale, nfljersey188001, nfljersey188002, niuwenzhi1, nnbbllssjersey5200, not404findstore, nrl rugby league jerseys 2019, pepe sportswear, psg6689, psgmessi2022, putianshichengxiangqupanjunjiemaoyiyouxiangongsi, putianshilichengquchengmujinmaoyiyouxiangongsi, qualityjersey2024, real1jerseys, real2jerseys, realjersey, retro jerseys, retro688, retroes, rgsyf22, robess2026, rui666888, s3533, s3599, sbnation, scoresport, sdsdsdfbvsd, seller8931, shua1318, shunshun0517, soccer Jersey, soccer jersey 778, soccer kit, soccer1355jersey, soccer1878, soccer1933, soccer_jersey8, soccer_shirt, soccerjersey188 supplier, soccerjersey2023, soccerjersey88888, soccerjersey99999, soccerjerseys009, soccerjerseys2024, soccerwear_vip, sportingspace, sports2324, sportsjersey111, sportsshirt5031, springsports, stephen_curry, stockjersey, tanpeipei1134, telanpu, theamericabusiness, thumbsports, tomato_2023, tongbao2022, top quality jersey, topjersey1111, topjersey1998, topsoccersport, toysweethome, tubasport, ujkas88, ustarjersey, vi22ctorystore, wangruixue, wholesalejerseys2022, willfun1001, wjxzjj88888, woaiaobama555, wona_4733, wr123456789, wsr888888, wuqiliang5618, wystore, xbrjerseys, xcliang, xdstarjersey, xh_jerseys, xia_jersey168, xianglanshangmao, xianyouxianbangtouchenzifeijiajuweixiudian, xianyouxianlonghuachenhonggongyipinshanghang, xuankui568568, yangxinstore, yiyunsports166, yourarticles01, yunkuo-93, zengduquanlingbaihuodian, zxc503, zyx05200 (ajw)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
34 34 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 06/28 5:02 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Round 11) filed by DB Ventures Limited (Cook, Abbie)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Mon 07/01 9:02 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING34 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to handbag6668886,. jerseycr7; and Ronaldo jersey only. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Mon 06/24 9:26 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING33 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to fouroceans_sport only. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
33 33 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 06/21 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Round 10) filed by DB Ventures Limited (Cook, Abbie)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Mon 06/17 10:56 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING32 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (gww)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
32 32 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 06/14 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Round 9) filed by DB Ventures Limited (Cook, Abbie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Tue 05/21 10:08 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING31 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (ces)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
31 31 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 05/20 12:07 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Round 8) filed by DB Ventures Limited (Cook, Abbie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Tue 05/14 8:11 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING30 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (ces)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 11, 2024
30 30 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Sat 05/11 12:37 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Round 7) filed by DB Ventures Limited (Cook, Abbie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Tue 05/07 10:13 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING29 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (ces)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
29 29 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 05/06 1:25 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Round 6) filed by DB Ventures Limited (Cook, Abbie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Thu 04/25 10:48 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING28 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (pdt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
28 28 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 04/24 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Round 5) filed by DB Ventures Limited (Cook, Abbie)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Wed 04/24 3:23 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING24 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (pdt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/23 10:08 AM
ORDER granting26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before May 22, 2024. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 4/23/24. (ces)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
26 26 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Mon 04/22 1:54 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,,,, with Brief In Support by ALOTS, LUYAN ART.(Myers, Albert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/22 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Albert M. Myers on behalf of ALOTS, LUYAN ART (Myers, Albert)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 04/19 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Round 4) filed by DB Ventures Limited (Cook, Abbie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
22 22 order Preliminary Injunction Tue 04/16 10:20 AM
PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 4/16/24. (ces)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Tue 04/16 10:21 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (ces)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
23 23 minutes Motion Hearing Tue 04/16 10:39 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eleanor L. Ross: Motion Hearing held on 4/15/2024. Court called to order. Court heard argument regarding outstanding motions. Court held the issues UNDER ADVISEMENT. Court adjourned. Hearing concluded. (Court Reporter Elizabeth Cohn)(ces)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 04/15 11:44 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Round 1) filed by DB Ventures Limited (Cooper, Jason)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Mon 04/15 10:13 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING20 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (ces)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 04/12 6:34 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Round 3) filed by DB Ventures Limited (Cook, Abbie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Tue 04/09 2:00 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING19 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendants Cardhome and feilaystc pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (pdt)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 04/05 11:17 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Round 2) filed by DB Ventures Limited (Cook, Abbie)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/05 11:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Abbie Alexis Cook on behalf of DB Ventures Limited (Cook, Abbie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Unseal Document Thu 04/04 12:04 PM
ORDER granting15 MOTION to Lift Seal. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to LIFT the seal previously imposed pursuant to this Courts March 6, 2024 Order6 , and all judicial records in this matter shall be made publicly available. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on this 4th day of April, 2024. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
16 16 service Return of Service Executed Thu 04/04 10:47 AM
Return of Service Executed by DB Ventures Limited to All Defendants. The Complaint, Summonses, and Temporary Restraining Order were served on April 1st, 2024. Answer due on April 22nd, 2024. (pdt)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Unseal Document Thu 04/04 10:30 AM
MOTION to Lift Seal and Memorandum of Law in Support by DB Ventures Limited. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, March 29, 2024
14 14 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion13 and EXTENDS the TRO for an additional fourteen (14) days, to April 15, 2024, the date when the Court will next be able to accommodate a hearing in this case. The Court hereby RESCHEDULES the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction to occur at 4:00 p.m. on Monday, April 15, 2024. (See Order for Additional Details). Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 3/29/24. (ces)
Related: [-]
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing (via email) to Attorneys Carrie A. Hanlon and Jason Cooper re14 Order on Motion for Extension of Time. (ces)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
13 13 MOTION to Extend Ex Parte TRO, Asset Freeze Order, and Order to Show Cause by DB Ventures Limited.(ces)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 18, 2024
12 12 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ASSET FREEZE ORDER, AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 3/18/24. (ces)
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER granting7 Motion for Authorization to Serve Process on Defendants by Electronic Means Pursuant to Rule 4(f)(3). Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 3/18/24. (ces)
Related: [-]
10 10 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ASSET FREEZE ORDER, AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 3/18/24. (ces)
Related: [-]
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Attorneys Carrie A. Hanlon and Jason Cooper re10 Order. (ces)
Related: [-]
NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 4/2/2024 at 11:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1708 before Judge Eleanor L. Ross. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/2/2024 at 11:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1708 before Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (ces)
Related: [-]
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Attorneys Carrie A. Hanlon and Jason Cooper re11 Order. (ces)
Related: [-]
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Attorneys Carrie A. Hanlon and Jason Cooper as to DB Ventures Limited re12 Order. (ces)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Attorneys Carrie A. Hanlon and Jason Cooper as to DB Ventures Limited re8 Order. (ces)
Related: [-]
Clerk's Notation re3 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement by DB Ventures Limited identifying Corporate Parent Authentic Brands Group, LLC for DB Ventures Limited. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
9 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (ces)
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
Related: [-]
7 7 MOTION for Authorization to Serve Process on Defendants by Electronic Means Pursuant to Rule 4(f)(3) with Brief In Support by DB Ventures Limited.(ces)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Authorization to Serve Process on Defendants by Electronic Means Pursuant to Rule 4(f)(3),
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order on Motion for Authorization to Serve Process on Defendant
6 6 ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 3/6/24. (ces)
Related: [-]
5 5 Plaintiff's MOTION for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED , MOTION for Asset Freeze Order, MOTION for Order to Show Cause with Brief In Support by DB Ventures Limited.(ces)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Ex Parte TRO,
Att: 2 Declaration of Kevin Clarke,
Att: 3 Declaration of Jeffrey B. Sladkus,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order on Motion for Ex Parte TRO
4 4 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (ces)
Related: [-]
3 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by DB Ventures Limited identifying Corporate Parent Authentic Brands Group, LLC for DB Ventures Limited. (ces)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal with Brief In Support by DB Ventures Limited.(ces)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal
1 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by DB Ventures Limited. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13271662)(ces) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B (part 1) to Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B (part 2) to Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit B (part 3) to Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit B (part 4) to Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 6 Exhibit B (part 5) to Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 7 Exhibit B (part 6) to Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 8 Exhibit B (part 7) to Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 9 Exhibit B (part 8) to Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 10 Exhibit B (part 9) to Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 11 Exhibit B (part 10) to Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 12 Exhibit B (part 11) to Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 13 Civil Cover Sheet
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office re4 A.O. Form 120. (ces)
Related: [-]
Submission of5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED , MOTION for Asset Freeze Order, MOTION for Order to Show Cause,7 MOTION for Authorization to Serve Process on Defendants by Electronic Means Pursuant to Rule 4(f)(3), to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (ces)
Related: [-]
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Attorneys Carrie A. Hanlon and Jason Cooper re6 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. (ces)
Related: [-]
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing (via email) to Attorneys Carrie A. Hanlon and Jason Cooper re9 Electronic Summons Issued. (ces)
Related: [-]