Maryland District Court
Judge:Adam B Abelson
Case #: 8:24-cv-00994
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act - Civil Action for Deprivation of Rights
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 01, 2024 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Angela Alsobrooks
1301 McCormick Drive Suite 4000
Largo, MD 20774
Represented By
Dwight David Jackson, I
Prince George'S County Government
contact info
Defendant
Malik Aziz
8801 Police Plaza
Upper Marlboro, MD 20772
Represented By
Dwight David Jackson, I
Prince George'S County Government
contact info
Defendant
James McCreary
8801 Police Plaza
Upper Marlboro, MD 20772
Represented By
Dwight David Jackson, I
Prince George'S County Government
contact info
Defendant
Prince George's County Police Department
8801 Police Plaza
Upper Marlboro, MD 20772
Represented By
Dwight David Jackson, I
Prince George'S County Government
contact info
Defendant
Brad Pyle
8801 Police Plaza
Upper Marlboro, MD 20772
Represented By
Dwight David Jackson, I
Prince George'S County Government
contact info
Defendant
Jacqulyn Rafferty
"Jackie" 8801 Police Plaza
Upper Marlboro, MD 20772
Represented By
Dwight David Jackson, I
Prince George'S County Government
contact info
Defendant
David Robinson
8801 Police Plaza
Upper Marlboro, MD 20772
Represented By
Dwight David Jackson, I
Prince George'S County Government
contact info
Defendant
Jordan Swonger
8801 Police Plaza
Upper Marlboro, MD 20772
Represented By
Dwight David Jackson, I
Prince George'S County Government
contact info
Defendant
Donnell Tunner
1301 McCormick Drive Suite 4000
Largo, MD 20774
Represented By
Dwight David Jackson, I
Prince George'S County Government
contact info
Defendant
Prince George's County, Maryland
Represented By
Dwight David Jackson, I
Prince George'S County Government
contact info
Plaintiff
David Gross
1802 Norris Farm Place
Bryan's Road, MD 20616
Represented By
Ray M Shepard
The Shepard Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles Russell
Represented By
Ray M Shepard
The Shepard Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 03/19 10:23 AM
ORDER granting23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; Joint Status Report due July 7, 2025. Signed by Judge Adam B Abelson on 3/19/2025. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
23 23 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 03/06 9:35 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by David Gross, Charles Russell(Shepard, Ray)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, January 10, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order Fri 01/10 11:44 AM
ORDER extending deadlines; Status Report due March 7, 2025. Signed by Judge Adam B Abelson on 1/10/2025. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
21 21 misc Status Report Tue 01/07 2:30 PM
STATUS REPORT by David Gross, Charles Russell(Shepard, Ray)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 10/03 12:10 PM
ORDER granting19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to the Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Adam B Abelson on 10/3/2024. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
19 19 motion Extension of Time Mon 09/30 12:53 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to the Scheduling Order by David Gross, Charles Russell(Shepard, Ray)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 09/17 12:52 PM
Case reassigned to Judge Adam B Abelson. Judge Theodore D. Chuang no longer assigned to the case. (chs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
18 18 misc 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Tue 05/28 2:31 PM
Decline to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Modified on 5/28/2024 (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order Fri 05/24 12:43 PM
ORDER directing Plaintiffs to file a Notice stating whether they consent to the transfer of this case to a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings within 7 days; referring case to United States Magistrate Judge for mediation. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 5/24/2024. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
16 16 minutes Case Management Conference Fri 05/24 12:06 PM
Case Management Conference held on 5/24/2024 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang. (Court Reporter: FTR Recording\2B) (ds2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
14 14 order Scheduling Order Mon 05/13 3:22 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 9/25/2024. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 5/13/2024. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/13 3:41 PM
PAPERLESS NOTICE. A RULE 16 CONFERENCE is scheduled for May 24, 2024 at 11:30 a.m. To join the call at the scheduled time: (1) Dial 1-888-557-8511. (2) Enter access code 3008173, followed by the # key. You will then be placed on hold until Chambers dials into the call, at which point you will be prompted to enter a security code. (3) When prompted, enter security code 05241130 followed by the # key. The call will be recorded, so please do not use speakerphones as they compromise sound quality. Also, we ask that parties not remain on the conference line after the Judge has left the call, to ensure that the line is free for other calls that may be on the Judge's calendar. The parties are reminded that they should be prepared to address whether they consent to have all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge and whether they wish to participate in a mediation session with a Magistrate Judge, whether before, during, or after discovery. Parties are expected to consult with their clients and confer with each other on these issues in advance of the Rule 16 Case Management Conference and, if possible, present joint views to the Court. (ds2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/10 4:52 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Prince George's County, Maryland.(Jackson, Dwight)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Fri 05/10 4:44 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Donnell Tunner (Jackson, Dwight)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Fri 05/10 4:40 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Angela Alsobrooks (Jackson, Dwight)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Fri 05/10 4:33 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Brad Pyle (Jackson, Dwight)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Fri 05/10 4:29 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Jacqulyn Rafferty (Jackson, Dwight)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Fri 05/10 4:24 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Jordan Swonger (Jackson, Dwight)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Fri 05/10 4:19 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by David Robinson (Jackson, Dwight)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Fri 05/10 4:13 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Malik Aziz (Jackson, Dwight)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
5 5 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Thu 05/09 4:53 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Prince George's County Police Department (Jackson, Dwight)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Thu 05/09 4:44 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Prince George's County, Maryland (Jackson, Dwight)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 04/05 11:01 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Angela Alsobrooks, Malik Aziz, James McCreary, Prince George's County Police Department, Prince George's County, Maryland, Brad Pyle, Jacqulyn Rafferty, David Robinson, Jordan Swonger, Donnell Tunner.(bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Case Management Order Fri 04/05 10:48 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/5/2024. (ds2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/04 7:31 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11186120.), filed by Charles A. russell, David Gross.(Shepard, Ray)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons