New Jersey District Court
Judge:Esther Salas
Referred: Cathy L Waldor
Case #: 2:24-cv-04502
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2024
Terminated:May 10, 2024
Last checked: Monday Sep 30, 2024 4:53 AM EDT
Defendant
WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Plaintiff
H.S.
180 TALMADGE ROAD #557
EDISON, NJ 08817


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, May 10, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Fri 05/10 11:48 AM
ORDER of Withdrawal of Complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the file. Upon the payment of the filing fee or the submission of a completed, signed application to proceed in forma pauperis , Plaintiff may move to reopen this matter. The Clerk's Office shall forward a copy of this Order via regular mail. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 5/10/2024. (dam)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation (public) Fri 05/10 11:49 AM
6 Order sent via Regular Mail to Plaintiff on 5/10/2024. (dam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
5 5 misc Letter Thu 05/09 11:15 AM
Letter addressed to the Clerk regarding Waiver of Service.(ECF Help Desk) (dam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter re inability to waive service,
Att: 2 Exhibit re E-mail
Friday, April 26, 2024
4 4 misc Letter Tue 04/30 9:43 AM
Letter with unexecuted waiver of summons from H.S.(mxw, ) Related [+]
Related: [-] ceived via ECF Help Desk Email
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
3 3 misc Letter: Filing Fee or IFP due Tue 04/09 10:29 AM
Clerk's Letter: Complaint not accompanied by the filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis. (ps)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Guidelines for Pro Se Filers Thu 04/04 3:13 PM
Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (pnm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
1 1 service Complaint Received Thu 04/04 3:07 PM
Complaint Received.(pnm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Plaintiff's Letter to Wells Fargo,
Att: 3 Notice to Receive Electronic Notifications