Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Curtis L Collier
Referred: Christopher H Steger
Case #: 1:24-cv-00140
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 01, 2024 5:01 AM EDT
Defendant
ROI Fund II, LLC
Defendant
Jane and John Does 1-25
Defendant
The Well Fund LLC
Represented By
J. Michael Holloway
Litchford, Pearce & Associates
contact info
Defendant
The Dira Group
Represented By
Kimberly Michelle Ingram-Hogan
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings
contact info
Michael H Brady
Whiteford Taylor & Preston
contact info
Joseph E. Atkinson
Whiteford Taylor & Preston
contact info
Dale G Mullen
Whiteford, Taylor & Preston LLP
contact info
Eric H Feiler
Whiteford, Taylor & Preston LLP
contact info
Defendant
Scorpio Ref, LLC
Defendant
Rhino Onward International, LLC
Defendant
ROI Fund IV, LLC
Defendant
ROI Fund III, LLC
Defendant
Chestnut Holdings, LLC
Defendant
ROI Fund I, LLC
Defendant
Brian Kawamura
Represented By
David M Eldridge
Eldridge & Cravens, P.C.
contact info
Loretta G Cravens
Eldridge & Cravens, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Investments, LLC
Represented By
Cara J Alday
Patrick, Beard, Schulman & Jacoway
contact info
Lance W Pope
Patrick, Beard, Schulman & Jacoway
contact info
Gary R Patrick
Patrick, Beard, Schulman & Jacoway
contact info
Defendant
Steven Frost
Represented By
Cara J Alday
Patrick, Beard, Schulman & Jacoway
contact info
Lance W Pope
Patrick, Beard, Schulman & Jacoway
contact info
Gary R Patrick
Patrick, Beard, Schulman & Jacoway
contact info
Defendant
Lisa Frost
Represented By
Cara J Alday
Patrick, Beard, Schulman & Jacoway
contact info
Lance W Pope
Patrick, Beard, Schulman & Jacoway
contact info
Gary R Patrick
Patrick, Beard, Schulman & Jacoway
contact info
Defendant
Jonathan Frost
Defendant
Matthew Dira
Represented By
Kimberly Michelle Ingram-Hogan
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings
contact info
Michael H Brady
Whiteford Taylor & Preston
contact info
Joseph E. Atkinson
Whiteford Taylor & Preston
contact info
Dale G Mullen
Whiteford, Taylor & Preston LLP
contact info
Eric H Feiler
Whiteford, Taylor & Preston LLP
contact info
Defendant
Croft & Frost, PLLC
Plaintiff
Brian Harding
Represented By
Benjamin A Gastel
Herzfeld, Suetholz, Gastel, Leniski And Wall, PLLC
contact info
Scott A Kramer
The Kramer Law Firm
contact info
Alyson Beridon
Herzfeld, Suetholz, Gastel, Leniski And Wall, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Stacy Strobl
Represented By
Benjamin A Gastel
Herzfeld, Suetholz, Gastel, Leniski And Wall, PLLC
contact info
Scott A Kramer
The Kramer Law Firm
contact info
Alyson Beridon
Herzfeld, Suetholz, Gastel, Leniski And Wall, PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Paul Croft
Terminated: 09/05/2024

GPO Feb 19 2025
MEMORANDUM. The Court will DENY the motion to dismiss the complaint by Defendant, the Well Fund, LLC (Doc. 59). AN APPROPRIATE ORDER WILL ENTER. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 2/19/2025. (MKM)
GPO Feb 20 2025
MEMORANDUM granting 49 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (personal jurisdiction) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Matthew Dira, The Dira Group, granting 74 MOTION to Adopt 72 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Matthew Dira, The Dira Group filed by Brian Kawamura, denying 52 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Brian Kawamura, granting in part and denying in part 51 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by Brian Kawamura. APPROPRIATE ORDERS WILL ENTER. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 2/20/2025. (MKM)
GPO Apr 14 2025
MEMORANDUM: Accordingly, the Court DENIES Defendant Kawamuras motion to certify appeal under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b). (Doc. 97.) Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 4/14/25. (ABF)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
106 106 9 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Mon 04/14 11:25 AM
MEMORANDUM: Accordingly, the Court DENIES Defendant Kawamuras motion to certify appeal under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b). (Doc. 97.) Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 4/14/25. (ABF)
Related: [-]
105 105 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal Mon 04/14 11:10 AM
ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant Brian Kawamuras motion to certify for interlocutory appeal the Courts February 20, 2025, Order denying his motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (Doc. 94) and to stay the case as to himself pending appeal. (Doc. 97.) Plaintiffs Stacy Strobl and Brian Harding responded in opposition to Defendants motion. (Doc. 100.) For the reasons discussed in the accompanying Memorandum, Defendants motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) (Doc. 97) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 4/14/25. (ABF)
Related: [-]