California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00634
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2024
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 12:57 AM PDT
Defendant
Daniel Reyes (1)
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Carmen Rivera
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Parker Gardner-Erickson
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info

GPO Mar 24 2025
JUDGMENT as to Daniel Reyes (1). Count 1: Defendant committed to the BOP for a term of twenty-four (24) months; supervised release for three (3) years; no fine; $100 penalty assessment imposed; appeal rights waived. Signed by Chief District Judge Cynthia Bashant. (lrf)

Docket last updated: 04/05/2024 2:38 AM PDT
Sunday, March 03, 2024
Arrest of Daniel Reyes (no document attached) (mme) [3:24-mj-00867-MMP]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Daniel Reyes.(mme) [3:24-mj-00867-MMP]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Daniel Reyes: Initial Appearance set for 3/4/2024 before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit. (no document attached) (fjp) [3:24-mj-00867-MMP]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Parker Gardner-Erickson appearing for USA. (Gardner-Erickson, Parker)Attorney Parker Gardner-Erickson added to party USA(pty:pla) (ggv). [3:24-mj-00867-MMP]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit: Initial Appearance as to Daniel Reyes held on 3/4/2024. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Daniel Reyes., Detention Hearing as to Daniel Reyes held on 3/4/2024. USA oral motion for detention(Flight); motion denied as to Daniel Reyes. Rule 5 advisement provided. Bond set as to Daniel Reyes (1) $30,000 PS secured by 2 FRAs (1 related) and $3,000 cash deposit. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 3/14/24 at 2:00pm before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit. Arraignment set for 4/02/24 at 2:00pm before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit. ) (Interpreter Salvador Castellanos). (CD# 3/4/2024 MMP 24-1:2:08;2:27-2:35;Det Hrg 2:28-2:35). (Plaintiff Attorney Jeffers Nyaradi AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Ryan DeLa Rosa FD-S/A). (aje) Modified on 3/5/2024 (aje). [3:24-mj-00867-MMP]
Related: [-]
5 5 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Daniel Reyes (no document attached) (aje) [3:24-mj-00867-MMP]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Daniel Reyes (1) $30,000 P/S secured by 2 FRAs (1 related), 10% cash deposit.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit on 3/4/2024. (cxl) [3:24-mj-00867-MMP]
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Daniel Reyes (cxl) [3:24-mj-00867-MMP]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER as to Daniel Reyes: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit on 3/4/24. (aje) [3:24-mj-00867-MMP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Carmen Rivera appearing for Daniel Reyes (Rivera, Carmen)Attorney Carmen Rivera added to party Daniel Reyes(pty:dft) (stn). [3:24-mj-00867-MMP]
Related: [-]
7 7 Notice of Assertion of Rights by Daniel Reyes (Rivera, Carmen) (stn). [3:24-mj-00867-MMP]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
11 11 Order on Stipulated Continuance of a Preliminary Hearing as to Daniel Reyes. Preliminary Hearing set for 4/2/2024 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit on 3/11/2024. (yem) [3:24-mj-00867-MMP]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
12 12 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Gardner-Erickson, Parker) (stn). [3:24-mj-00867-MMP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
13 13 INFORMATION as to Daniel Reyes (1) count(s) 1. (fjp)
Related: [-]
14 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit: Arraignment on Count 1 of the Information as to Daniel Reyes (1) held on 4/2/2024. Not guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 5/6/2024 at 2:00 PM before Judge Cynthia Bashant. (Interpreter Elizabeth Valera). (CD# 4/2/2024 MMP 24:2:04-2:16). (Plaintiff Attorney Joel Doolin, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Carmen Rivera, FD). (fjp)
Related: [-]