California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-01301
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2024
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 12:30 AM PDT
Defendant
Marlene Frayre-Martinez (1)
Represented By
Gerard Jeffrey Wasson
Law Office Of Gerard J. Wasson
contact info
Material Witness
Citlali Guadalupe Castillo-Zavala
Represented By
Michael S Pedretti
Law Offices Of Michael S. Pedretti
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jacqueline Magali Jimenez
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/05/2024 1:54 AM PDT
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
Arrest of Marlene Frayre-Martinez. (no document attached) (mef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Marlene Frayre-Martinez.(mef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Minute Order. Material Witness Attorney Michael S Pedretti appointed for Citlali Guadalupe Castillo-Zavala. Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Marlene Frayre-Martinez: Initial Appearance set for 4/3/2024 before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. (no document attached) (fjp)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Jacqueline Magali Jimenez appearing for USA. (Jimenez, Jacqueline)Attorney Jacqueline Magali Jimenez added to party USA(pty:pla) (axi).
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres: Initial Appearance as to Marlene Frayre-Martinez held on 4/3/2024. Gerard Jeffrey Wasson (N/A) appointed for Marlene Frayre-Martinez. Detention Hearing as to Marlene Frayre-Martinez held on 4/3/2024. USA oral motion for detention; motion denied as to Marlene Frayre-Martinez. Bond set as to Marlene Frayre-Martinez (1) $20,000 PS (1 FRA & 10% deposit). Preliminary Hearing set for 4/16/24 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. Arraignment set for 5/2/24 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres., (Interpreter Daniel Novoa). (CD# 4/3/2024 VET 353-500). (Plaintiff Attorney Jacqueline Jimenez AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Marissa Martinez FD). (ecf)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER as to Marlene Frayre-Martinez: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on 4/3/2024. (tkl)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Marlene Frayre-Martinez (1) $20,000 PS secured by 1 FRA & 10% deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on 4/3/2024. (cxl)
Related: [-]
8 8 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Marlene Frayre-Martinez (cxl)
Related: [-]