Florida Middle District Court
Case #: 6:24-cr-00082
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2024
Terminated:Dec 12, 2024
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 3:49 AM EDT
Defendant
James Edward Cox, Jr. (1)
Represented By
James B. Kelly, III
Salazar & Kelly Law Group, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Dana Edward Hill
Us Attorney'S Office - Flm
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/11/2025 10:13 PM EST
Friday, March 01, 2024
1 1 12 pgs COMPLAINT as to Henry Cox (1), James Cox (2). (ECJ) [6:24-mj-01226-EJK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
Arrest of James Cox on 3/5/2024 (TNP) [6:24-mj-01226-EJK]
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs Minute Entry for In Person proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick: Initial Appearance as to James Cox held on 3/5/2024. (Digital) (TNP) [6:24-mj-01226-EJK]
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by James Cox (TNP) [6:24-mj-01226-EJK]
Related: [-]
8 8 Ore Tenus MOTION for Detention by USA as to James Cox. (TNP) [6:24-mj-01226-EJK]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL, granting 8 Ore Tenus Motion for Detention as to James Cox (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 3/5/2024. (TNP) [6:24-mj-01226-EJK]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE of Standing Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act,[LINK:3:20-mc-20-TJC, Doc 1] as to Henry Cox, James Cox: Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' disclosure obligation under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny and orders the United States to comply with that obligation. Violating this order may result in consequences, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, and other sanctions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan. (TNP) [6:24-mj-01226-EJK]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
12 12 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 3/5/2024 as to James Cox. (EAM) [6:24-mj-01226-EJK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
13 13 1 pgs NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: James B. Kelly, III appearing for James Cox . (Kelly, James) [6:24-mj-01226-EJK]
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 17, 2024
14 14 10 pgs MOTION for Bond or Pretrial Release. by James Cox. (Kelly, James) [6:24-mj-01226-EJK]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
15 15 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION in case as to James Cox:14 MOTION for Bond or Pretrial Release. . Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2024 at 03:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 C before Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. Defendants presence is required.(JOR) [6:24-mj-01226-EJK]
Related: [-]
16 16 Case as to Henry Cox, James Cox Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:24-mj-1226-EJK. Magistrate Judge David A. Baker no longer assigned to the case. (RPB) [6:24-mj-01226-EJK]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
17 17 1 pgs Minute Entry for In Person proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd: DETENTION HEARING as to James Cox held on 3/20/2024. (Digital) (JOR) [6:24-mj-01226-EJK]
Related: [-]
20 20 ENDORSED ORDER denying 14 Motion for Bond as to James Cox (2). Defendant, James Cox is to remain detained pending further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 3/21/2024. (JOR) [6:24-mj-01226-EJK]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
21 21 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by James Cox. (Kelly, James) [6:24-mj-01226-EJK]
Related: [-]
22 22 WAIVER of speedy trial through 06/30/2024 by James Cox (Kelly, James) [6:24-mj-01226-EJK]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
23 23 6 pgs INDICTMENT returned in open court as to James Edward Cox, Jr (1) count(s) 1-2, 3-4, 5. (AJS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Restricted Unredacted Indictment