Florida Middle District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00042
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2024
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 3:50 AM EDT
Defendant
Tyler D. Williams (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Patrick Darcey
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/05/2024 4:35 AM EDT
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
1 1 MOTION to Seal Indictment and Related Documents by USA as to Tyler D. Williams. (JK)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER granting 1 Motion to Seal Indictment and Related Documents as to Tyler D. Williams (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 4/3/2024. (JK)
Related: [-]
3 3 INDICTMENT returned in open court as to Tyler D. Williams (1) count(s) 1, 2. (JK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Restricted Unredacted Indictment