Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00703
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2024
Terminated:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 2:56 AM CDT
Defendant
Carlos Morales (1)
Represented By
Orlando Mondragon
Law Office Of Orlando Mondragon
contact info
Michael F. Gorman
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Defendant
Rebekah Sue Walters (2)
Represented By
Peter R. Escobar
Peter R. Escobar
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Susanna Martinez
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Dec 04 2024
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on felony guilty plea before the United States Magistrate Judge as to Rebekah Sue Walters. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (ep1)
GPO Dec 13 2024
ORDER accepting re 101 Findings of Fact on Plea as to Rebekah Sue Walters. Guilty plea accepted. Signed by District Judge Leon Schydlower. (ep1)
GPO Jan 06 2025
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on felony guilty plea before the United States Magistrate Judge as to Carlos Morales. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (ep1)
GPO Jan 14 2025
ORDER accepting re 110 Findings of Fact on Plea as to Carlos Morales. Guilty plea accepted. Signed by District Judge Leon Schydlower. (em)

Docket last updated: 04/21/2025 9:13 PM CDT
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
Arrest of Carlos Morales, Rebekah Sue Walters (ll) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
Notice of Correction: re1 Complaint, incorrect document was attached. (ll) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Carlos Morales by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (ll) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda as to Carlos Morales, Rebekah Sue Walters. (ll) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Carlos Morales. (ll) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Rebekah Sue Walters. (ll) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Carlos Morales. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (ll) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert F. Castaneda:Initial Appearance in Person as to Carlos Morales held on 3/7/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required (E. Gallegos) as to Carlos Morales (Court Reporter ERO.) (ll) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER SETTING HEARING IN PERSON as to Carlos Morales, (Detention Hearing set for 3/12/2024 09:00 AM in El Paso before Judge Miguel A. Torres, Preliminary Hearing set for 3/12/2024 09:00 AM in El Paso before Judge Miguel A. Torres), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Carlos Morales. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (ll) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Carlos Morales (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (ll) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert F. Castaneda:Initial Appearance NOT held as to Rebekah Sue Walters held on 3/7/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter ERO.) (ll) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Rebekah Sue Walters (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (ll) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
10 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael F. Gorman appearing for Carlos Morales . Attorney Michael F. Gorman added to party Carlos Morales(pty:dft) (Gorman, Michael) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
11 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Carlos Morales. (Gorman, Michael) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Rebekah Sue Walters by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (ll) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
Attorney Michael F. Gorman terminated as to Carlos Morales. (mv) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER GRANTING11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Carlos Morales. Therefore, in the interests of justice, the Office of the Federal Public Defender is excused of any further responsibility in this matter and is REMOVED from his representation of this Defendant. The Court APPOINTS CJA Panel Attorney Orlando Mondragon to represent said Defendant in this case. (1). Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (dt) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
13 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Susanna Martinez appearing for USA. . Attorney Susanna Martinez added to party USA(pty:pla) (Martinez, Susanna) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
14 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Miguel A. Torres:Initial Appearance as to Rebekah Sue Walters held on 3/11/2024, Defendant to Retain Attorney (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Rebekah Sue Walters (Court Reporter ERO.) (ll) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs ORDER SETTING HEARING as to Rebekah Sue Walters, (Detention Hearing set for 3/14/2024 09:00 AM in El Paso before Judge Miguel A. Torres, Preliminary Hearing set for 3/14/2024 09:00 AM in El Paso before Judge Miguel A. Torres), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Rebekah Sue Walters. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (ll) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
16 16 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing by Carlos Morales (ll) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
17 17 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Peter R. Escobar appearing for Rebekah Sue Walters . Attorney Peter R. Escobar added to party Rebekah Sue Walters(pty:dft) (Escobar, Peter) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER OF DETENTION: DETAIN WITHOUT BOND as to Carlos Morales. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (ll) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
ORAL MOTION to Continue by USA as to Rebekah Sue Walters. (bg2) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING [] ORAL Motion to Continue as to Rebekah Sue Walters (2) by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (bg2) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
19 19 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Rebekah Sue Walters (bg2) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
20 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Miguel A. Torres: Miscellaneous Hearing as to Rebekah Sue Walters held on 3/14/2024 DETENTION HEARING CONTINUED. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Due Process Protections Act Warning given in Open Court as to Rebekah Sue Walters, Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Rebekah Sue Walters (Court Reporter ERO.) (bg2) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
21 21 Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Rebekah Sue Walters. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (bg2) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
22 22 ORDER RESETTING DETENTION HEARING - CONTINUED as to Rebekah Sue Walters, ( Detention Hearing RESET for 3/21/2024 02:30 PM before Judge Miguel A. Torres). Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (bg2) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
ORAL ORDER DENYING3 Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond. Bond set to $15K-10% C.D. as to Rebekah Sue Walters (2)by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (ll) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER Bond set as to Rebekah Sue Walters (2) $15K-10% C.D. by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (ll) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
23 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Miguel A. Torres:Detention Hearing as to Rebekah Sue Walters held on 3/21/2024, Court denies Motion to Detain, Bond set $15K-10% C.D. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Rebekah Sue Walters, Oral Due Process Protections Act Warning given in Open Court as to Rebekah Sue Walters (Court Reporter ERO.) (ll) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Torres (bot2)
Related: [-]
25 25 SECURED Bond Filed as to Rebekah Sue Walters in amount of $15,000.00 10% C.D. Receipt # 2170.(ll) [3:24-mj-01011-MAT]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted Bond
26 26 5 pgs INDICTMENT Related [+] with Notice of Forfeiture included as to as to all defendants. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Carlos Morales (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Rebekah Sue Walters (2) count(s) 2, 3. (bot1)
Related: [-] dacted Version
28 28 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Carlos Morales (bot2)
Related: [-]
29 29 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Rebekah Sue Walters (bot2)
Related: [-]