Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:24-cr-00326
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2024
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 3:01 AM CDT
Defendant
Jorge Marquez-Flores (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - McAllen
contact info
Rikin Shah
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Alexa Dinsmore Parcell
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Material Witness
Katherin Johana Amaya-Fuentes
Terminated: 04/02/2024
Represented By
Ranjit Singh Lidhar
Lidhar Law PLLC
contact info
Material Witness
Kevin Jose Rodriguez-Martinez
Terminated: 04/02/2024
Represented By
Ranjit Singh Lidhar
Lidhar Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/05/2024 4:36 AM CDT
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
Arrest of Jorge Marquez-Flores, filed. (LElizondo, 7) [7:24-mj-00208]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
1 1 2 pgs CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Jorge Marquez-Flores (1), filed. Initial Appearance set for 2/8/2024 at 09:01 AM before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker (AlmaGarcia, 7) Modified on 2/26/2024 (DebbieFlores, 7). (YeseniaIbarra, 7). [7:24-mj-00208]
Related: [-]
2 2 Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Katherin Johana Amaya-Fuentes, Kevin Jose Rodriguez-Martinez as to Jorge Marquez-Flores Initial Appearance for Material Witness set for 2/8/2024 at 09:02 AM before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker, filed.(AlmaGarcia, 7) Modified on 2/26/2024 (DebbieFlores, 7). (YeseniaIbarra, 7). [7:24-mj-00208]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
REMARK as to Jorge Marquez-Flores: MATERIAL WITNESS CASE ASSIGNED TO U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE DREW B. TIPTON. (DebbieFlores, 7) [7:24-mj-00208]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Scott Hacker. INITIAL APPEARANCE, PRELIMINARY HEARING, AND DETENTION HEARING on Criminal Complaint as to Jorge Marquez-Flores held on 2/8/2024. Defendant placed under oath. Defendant present in the courtroom. Defendant informed of legal rights, including the right to have a consular official notified about the arrest. Defendant requested the Government to notify the Mexican consulate. Defendant affirmed that the Financial Affidavit was correct and requested court-appointed counsel, which the Court GRANTED. Federal Public Defender appointed to represent Defendant. The Court advised Defendant as to the charged offense and any factual allegations in the criminal complaint. Defendant, through counsel, waived both the Preliminary and Detention Hearings. The Court entered findings, on the record, and found probable cause. The Court also entered findings that Defendant was a flight risk and denied bond; a written order to follow. In accordance with Rule 5(f), the Court orally admonished the Government of its disclosure obligations under Brady and the consequences of failing to provide such disclosure; a written order to follow. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshals Service. Appearances: Avery Benitez, AUSA; Christopher Gonzalez, AFPD. (USPO: Daniel Canchola) (ERO: Lazaro Elizondo) (Interpreter: Woody Lewis and Priscilla Muzza-Pastor, used) (DUSM: Andre Rodriguez). (DebbieFlores, 7) [7:24-mj-00208]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker: INITIAL APPEARANCE AND DETENTION HEARING OF MATERIAL WITNESSES Kevin Jose Rodriguez-Martinez and Katherin Johana Amaua-Fuentes held on 2/8/2024. Material Witnesses placed under oath. Material Witnesses present in the Courtroom. The Court appointed counsel to represent the material witnesses, and counsel, Mr. Ranjit Singh Lidhar, was present for the proceedings. The witnesses verified their true name and country of origin. The Court explained the purpose of the arrest and the nature of the attorney representation. The Government moved for detention. The Court heard from the parties regarding the issue of bond. The Court entered findings that the witnesses were a flight risk and denied bond; a written Order to follow. The Court directed counsel to immediately file motions to take the depositions of the material witnesses to help facilitate their release. Material Witness Hearing set for 2/12/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker. Mr. Singh Lidhar's presence is not required for the material witness hearing if Motion to Depose Material Witnesses is filed before the material witness hearing. Material Witnesses remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshals Service. Appearances: Avery Benitez, AUSA; Ranjit Singh Lidhar, CJA Attorney for Material Witnesses. (ERO: Lazaro Elizondo) (DUSM: Andre Rodriguez) (Interpreter: Woody Lewis and Priscilla Muzza-Pastor/used) (DebbieFlores, 7) [7:24-mj-00208]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Rikin Shah, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Jorge Marquez-Flores, filed.(Shah, Rikin) [7:24-mj-00208]
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Alexa Dinsmore Parcell appearing for USA, filed.(Parcell, Alexa) [7:24-mj-00208]
Related: [-]
3 3 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Jorge Marquez-Flores, filed.(LElizondo, 7) [7:24-mj-00208]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for Jorge Marquez-Flores (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (DebbieFlores, 7) [7:24-mj-00208]
Related: [-]
5 5 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Jorge Marquez-Flores. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (DebbieFlores, 7) [7:24-mj-00208]
Related: [-]
6 6 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Jorge Marquez-Flores. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (DebbieFlores, 7) [7:24-mj-00208]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness Kevin Jose Rodriguez-Martinez. Ranjit Singh Lidhar appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (DebbieFlores, 7) [7:24-mj-00208]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness Katherin Johana Amaua-Fuentes. Ranjit Singh Lidhar appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (DebbieFlores, 7) [7:24-mj-00208]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION - MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) Kevin Jose Rodriguez-Martinez and Katherin Johana Amaya-Fuentes to the custody of the United States Marshal. (Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge J. Scott Hacker.) Parties notified. (DebbieFlores, 7) [7:24-mj-00208]
Related: [-]
10 10 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Jorge Marquez-Flores, filed. [7:24-mj-00208]
Related: [-]
11 11 Unopposed MOTION to Take Deposition of Material Witness Katherin Johana Amaya-Fuentes by Katherin Johana Amaya-Fuentes as to Jorge Marquez-Flores, filed.(Singh Lidhar, Ranjit) [7:24-mj-00208]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
12 12 Unopposed MOTION to Take Deposition of Material Witness Kevin Jose Rodriguez-Martinez by Kevin Jose Rodriguez-Martinez as to Jorge Marquez-Flores, filed.(Singh Lidhar, Ranjit) [7:24-mj-00208]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, February 09, 2024
**Terminate Material Witness Hearing set for 2/12/2024 at 11:00 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker as to Jorge Marquez-Flores: See Docket no. 13. (DebbieFlores, 7) [7:24-mj-00208]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER granting11 Motion to Depose Material Witness Katherin Johana Amaya-Fuentes as to Jorge Marquez-Flores (1); granting12 Motion to Depose Material Witness Kevin Jose Rodriguez-Martinez as to Jorge Marquez-Flores (1). The videotaped depositions will be taken: as agreed by the parties, but no later than March 25, 2024 at 10:00 AM. (Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge J. Scott Hacker.) Parties notified. (DebbieFlores, 7) [7:24-mj-00208]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
14 14 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Jorge Marquez-Flores, filed. (SamanthaMedina, 7) [7:24-mj-00208]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
15 15 AMENDED ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Jorge Marquez-Flores ( Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (YeseniaIbarra, 7) [7:24-mj-00208]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
16 16 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Jorge Marquez-Flores (1) count(s) 1-3, filed. (OmarOrta, 7)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
17 17 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Jorge Marquez-Flores, filed.(OmarOrta, 7)
Related: [-]