Citizens Insurance Company of America v. Mullins Food Products, Incorporated
Original Case: 1:22-cv-01334
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01524 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 5:51 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellant
MULLINS FOOD PRODUCTS, INCORPORATED
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/05/2024 3:29 AM CDT |
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Mullins Food Products, Incorporated by 04/04/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 04/17/2024. Appellant's brief due on or before 05/13/2024 for Mullins Food Products, Incorporated. [1] [7374083] 24-1524 (MAN) [Entered: 04/04/2024 09:29 AM] | |
Att: 1 46 pgs Civil Case | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court |