Reginald Evans v. South Carolina Public Charter School District
Original Case: 3:23-cv-04966
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv.pr-01283 |
Type | civil private / private |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 5:11 AM EDT |
Defendant
THE HONORABLE ELLEN WEAVER, in her Official Capacities as South Carolina State Superintendent of Education
|
|
Defendant
THE HONORABLE HENRY DARGAN MCMASTER, in his Official Capacities as Govoner of the State of South Carolina
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC CHARTER SCHOOL DISTRICT
|
|
Plaintiff
GRACE ACHIEVEMENT CENTER FOR EXCELLENCE ACADEMIES' INC.
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
REGINALD EVANS, in his Capacities as an Officer and Founder Grace Academies Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/05/2024 4:15 AM EDT |
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 2 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:23-cv-04966-JFA. Case manager: RSewell. [1001547607] 24-1283 RHS [Entered: 04/04/2024 10:47 AM] | |
2 | 2 12 pgs INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed.. [1001547610] Informal Opening Brief due 04/29/2024 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. 24-1283 RHS [Entered: 04/04/2024 10:50 AM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001547614]. Due: 04/18/2024. 24-1283 RHS [Entered: 04/04/2024 10:55 AM] |