Antoinette Weathers v. Roy Witham
Original Case: 4:23-cv-00008
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv.pr-01286 |
Type | civil private / private |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 5:11 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellant
ROY C. WITHAM, Superintendent
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
VIRGINIA PENINSULA REGIONAL JAIL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
ANTOINETTE WEATHERS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/05/2024 4:15 AM EDT |
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 4:23-cv-00008-RBS-LRL. Case manager: CHalupa. [1001547695] 24-1286 CH [Entered: 04/04/2024 11:36 AM] | |
2 | 2 7 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 4:23-cv-00008-RBS-LRL. Mailed to: Blake Andrew Weiner. [1001547736] 24-1286 CH [Entered: 04/04/2024 12:00 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs NOTICE ISSUED re: case caption. Mailed to: Blake Weiner. [1001547875] 24-1286 CH [Entered: 04/04/2024 02:13 PM] |