International Brotherhood of Teamsters, et al v. Republic Airways Inc., et al
Original Case: 1:23-cv-00995
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01530 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 740 Labor - Railway Labor Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 5:51 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
REPUBLIC AIRWAYS INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
REPUBLIC AIRWAYS HOLDINGS INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
HYANNIS AIR SERVICE, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
AIRLINE PROFESSIONALS ASSOCIATION, TEAMSTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 1224
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
TEAMSTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 357
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/05/2024 3:29 AM CDT |
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Airline Professionals Association, Teamsters Local Union No. 1224, International Brotherhood of Teamsters and Teamsters Local Union No. 357 by 04/10/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 04/18/2024. Appellants' brief due on or before 05/14/2024 for Airline Professionals Association, Teamsters Local Union No. 1224, International Brotherhood of Teamsters and Teamsters Local Union No. 357. [1] [7374275] 24-1530 (PS) [Entered: 04/04/2024 04:02 PM] | |
Att: 1 30 pgs Civil Case | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court |