Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Arch Insurance Company
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Margaret M Garnett |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02591 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332jd Diversity-Declaratory Judgement |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 11:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Arch Insurance Company
|
|
Interested Party
National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford
|
|
Plaintiff
Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 04/29 4:11 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Margaret M. Garnett from Nicholas P. Calabria dated 04/29/2024. Document filed by Arch Insurance Company..(Calabria, Nicholas) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 4:08 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas P. Calabria on behalf of Arch Insurance Company..(Calabria, Nicholas) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/16 5:05 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford waiver sent on 4/10/2024, answer due 6/10/2024. Document filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America..(Szczepanski, Lisa) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Mon 04/08 12:19 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/11/2024 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Margaret M. Garnett. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 4/8/2024) (tg) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/08 9:41 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (vf) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/08 9:39 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Arch Insurance Company. (vf) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 04/08 9:36 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Margaret M. Garnett. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 04/08 9:36 AM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 04/08 9:36 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/05 2:32 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent The Phoenix Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc. for Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Document filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America..(Szczepanski, Lisa) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/05 10:47 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, re:1 Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America..(Szczepanski, Lisa) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/05 10:43 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Arch Insurance Company, re:1 Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America..(Szczepanski, Lisa) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/05 10:31 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Szczepanski, Lisa) |
|
1 | 1
17
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/05 10:29 AM
COMPLAINT against Arch Insurance Company, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29179117)Document filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America..(Szczepanski, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Arch Policy, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-Travelers Policy, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3-CNA Policy Part 1 of 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3-CNA Policy Part 2 of 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 3-CNA Policy Part 3 of 3, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 4-20141013 LPC-Franco Subcontract, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 5-LPC Accident Report, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 6-Underlying Complaint, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 7-Underlying 3P Complaint_LPC v. Franco, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 8-Underlying 2nd 3P Complaint_Franco v. USA Hoist, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 9-Underlying SJ decision, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 10-Underlying appellate decision, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 11-Underlying ntc of mot for judgment against Franco, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 12-20190125 CNA tender to Arch, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 13-20190422 GB denial to CNA, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 14-20191030 and 1106 CNA retenders to GB, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 15-20191113 GB denial to CNA, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 16-20210824 CNA tender to GB, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 17-20220316 GB denial to CNA, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 18-20230818 TRV reconsideration request to Arch, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit 19-20230913 GB exhaustion ltr to TRV, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit 20-20231004-0926 e-mails between TRV and Arch, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit 21-20230928 Arch response to TRV, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit 22-20231004 CNA ltr to GB re defense costs, | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit 23-20231005 Arch response to TRV |