Dropcases, LTD. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer L Rochon |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02589 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:0001 Establishment of PTO |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 11:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
|
|
Plaintiff
Dropcases, LTD.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Fri 04/26 9:11 AM
***EX-PARTE***DECLARATION of Christopher E. Maiwald in Support re:7 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order .. Document filed by Dropcases, LTD.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal:11 .(Boag, David) |
|
12 | 12
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Fri 04/26 9:09 AM
***EX-PARTE*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:7 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . . Document filed by Dropcases, LTD.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal:11 .(Boag, David) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Seal
Fri 04/26 9:07 AM
LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from David A. Boag dated April 26, 2024. Document filed by Dropcases, LTD...(Boag, David) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Sealed Document
Mon 04/22 1:24 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Proposed Temporary Restraining Order
Fri 04/19 4:43 PM
***EX-PARTE***PROPOSED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Document filed by Dropcases, LTD.. Related Document Number:7 . Motion or Order to File Under Seal:6 .(Boag, David) |
|
8 | 8
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Fri 04/19 4:38 PM
***EX-PARTE***DECLARATION of Christopher E. Maiwald in Support re:7 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order .. Document filed by Dropcases, LTD.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal:6 .(Boag, David) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Fri 04/19 4:26 PM
***EX-PARTE***EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Document filed by Dropcases, LTD..Motion or Order to File Under Seal:6 .(Boag, David) ( Refer to ECF Rule 13.19(b) and (c) for directions regarding promptly alerting the court to this filing. ) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Seal
Fri 04/19 4:21 PM
LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from David A. Boag dated April 19, 2024. Document filed by Dropcases, LTD...(Boag, David) |
|
misc
Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order
Fri 04/19 4:50 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Document No. 9 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
AO 120 Form Patent - Case Opening - Submitted
Mon 04/08 11:45 AM
AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(pc) |
|
misc
Note to Attorney to E-Mail PDF
Mon 04/08 11:42 AM
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney David A. Boag for noncompliance with Section 14.2 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document 1 Complaint, 2 Civil Cover Sheet to: caseopenings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (pc) |
||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
misc
AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney
Fri 04/05 1:11 PM
AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Boag, David) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Sealed Document
Fri 04/05 11:11 AM
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/05 10:51 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(pc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/05 10:50 AM
COMPLAINT against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number 28059)Document filed by Dropcases, LTD...(pc) |
|
utility
Case Designation
Fri 04/05 10:51 AM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/05 10:51 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
misc
Remark
Fri 04/05 10:55 AM
ORDER REDACTING PLEADING FILED IN 24MC148. Document filed by Dropcases, LTD...(pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney to Submit AO 120 Form/AO 121 Form
Fri 04/05 10:55 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney David A. Boag to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pc) |