THOMAS v. BOTTOM LINE CONCEPTS LLC
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Bloom |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21275 |
Nature of Suit | 485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Cause | 47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 12:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
BOTTOM LINE CONCEPTS LLC
3323 NORTHEAST 163RD STREET SUITE 302
NORTH MIAMI, FL 33160 |
|
Plaintiff
FRANCIS THOMAS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 04/24 1:12 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time until May 29, 2024, for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's First Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 04/24 12:00 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint re1 Complaint by BOTTOM LINE CONCEPTS LLC. Attorney Yaniv Adar added to party BOTTOM LINE CONCEPTS LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 5/8/2024.(Adar, Yaniv) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 04/24 1:47 PM
Reset Deadlines BOTTOM LINE CONCEPTS LLC answer due 5/29/2024. Per DE#8. (cqs) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Thu 04/11 9:06 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by FRANCIS THOMAS. BOTTOM LINE CONCEPTS LLC served on 4/8/2024, response/answer due 4/29/2024. (Eisenband, Michael) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
6
pgs
order
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report
Mon 04/08 12:09 PM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES: Within twenty-one (21) days of an appearance by a Defendant in this case, the parties are directed to prepare and file a joint scheduling report, as required by Local Rule 16.1. In addition, at the time of filing the joint scheduling report, the parties, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/5/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/05 3:16 PM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by FRANCIS THOMAS (Eisenband, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/05 3:15 PM
Summons Issued as to BOTTOM LINE CONCEPTS LLC. (nan) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 04/05 3:10 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/05 12:02 PM
COMPLAINT against BOTTOM LINE CONCEPTS LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17425736, filed by FRANCIS THOMAS.(Eisenband, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |