California Central District Court
Case #: 2:24-cv-02767
Nature of Suit690 Forfeiture/Penalty - Other
Cause18:0981 Civil Forfeiture
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2024
Terminated:Apr 11, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 05, 2024 5:16 AM PDT
Defendant
354 UNITS, MORE OR LESS, OF AN ARTICLE LABELED AS ELF BAR EB DESIGN AIRO MAX DISPOSABLE (5000 PUFFS) IN VARIOUS FLAVORS, ET AL.
Plaintiff
Unknown Plaintiff


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, April 11, 2024
2 2 utility Terminate Attorney Civil Case Opening - optional html form Thu 04/11 4:46 PM
In response to the opening of this case, the Clerk issued a Notice to Filer of Deficiencies in Attorney Case Opening. The Notice indicated that unless counsel corrected the identified discrepancy within two business days, the docket for this case number would be closed and no further filings would be permitted under this case number. Counsel has not corrected the discrepancy. Accordingly, this case is now closed. No further filings may be made under this case number, except, if applicable, to request a refund of fees using a Form G-124, Application for Refund of Fees. Should you wish to pursue this action, a new case must be filed and a new case number issued. (Case Terminated.) (sh)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
1 1 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Mon 04/08 8:16 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: You have attempted to open this case electronically but have failed to upload successfully the required PDF version of any initiating document, such as a complaint or notice of removal. You must file an initiating document within two business days of this notice or the docket for this case number will be closed. (sh)
Related: [-]