Fischman v. Stein et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Nelson Stephen Roman |
Case #: | 7:24-cv-02592 |
Nature of Suit | 423 Bankruptcy - Withdrawal 28 USC 157 |
Cause | 28:0157 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Case in other court: | USBC-SDNY, 23-09024 |
Debtor
Aaron Fischman
710 Loch Hurlyville Rd
Loch Sheldrake, NY 12759 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 1:14 PM EDT |
Counter Claimant
Yoel Weisshaus
1713 Wyoming Ave 18704
Forty Fort, PA 18704 |
|
Counter Defendant
Yoel Weisshaus
1713 Wyoming Ave 18704
Forty Fort, PA 18704 |
|
Cross Claimant
Shalom S. Maidenbaum, solely in his individual capacity
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Jonathan Stein
132 Spruce St.
Cedarhurst, NY 11516 |
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Aaron Fischman
710 Loch Hurlyville Rd
Loch Sheldrake, NY 12759 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aaron Fischman
710 Loch Hurlyville Rd
Loch Sheldrake, NY 12759 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Shalom Maidenbaum in his individual and official capacity on behalf of Cardis Enterprises International B.V. and Cardis Enterprises International N.V. and Cardis Enterprises International (USA), Inc.
132 Spruce St
Cedarhurst, NY 11516 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jonathan Stein
132 Spruce St.
Cedarhurst, NY 11516 |
Represented By
|
In Re
Aaron Fischman
710 Loch Hurlyville Rd
Loch Sheldrake, NY 12759 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 04/19 12:42 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 23-B-36038(CGM), 23-09024A. requesting conference upon withdrawing reference . Document filed by Yoel Weisshaus..(Weisshaus, Yoel) |
|
6 | 6
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 04/19 11:16 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re:1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 23-B-36038(CGM), 23-09024A. Declaration of Eric Berry Consenting to the Motion to withdraw the reference . Document filed by Shalom S. Maidenbaum, solely in his individual capacity, Jonathan Stein..(Berry, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Transcript from Hearing at which associated bankruptcy case was dismissed, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-Amended Notice for Fischmnan's deposition, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3-email from Anne Penachio re Fischman's refusal to appear at deposition | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/19 9:47 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric William Berry on behalf of Shalom S. Maidenbaum, solely in his individual capacity, Jonathan Stein..(Berry, Eric) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
misc
Mailing Receipt
Mon 04/15 10:25 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 4. Mailed to: Yoel Weisshaus 1713 Wyoming Ave 18704 Forty Fort, PA 18704. (sha) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing
Fri 04/12 10:56 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting3 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. ENDORSEMENT: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion and directs the Clerk of Court to mail a copy of this order to pro se Plaintiff Yoel Weisshaus and show service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 4/12/2024) (tg) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Permission for Electronic Case Filing
Mon 04/08 12:32 PM
MOTION for Permission for Yoel Weisshaus to participate in electronic case filing in this case...(kgo) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/05 12:14 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bkgc) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference
Fri 04/05 12:13 PM
MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 23-B-36038(CGM), 23-09024A. Document filed by Yoel Weisshaus(bkgc) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit | ||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 04/05 12:30 PM
Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (bkgc) |