National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsbugh, PA v. Voice Tele Services Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Margaret M Garnett |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02595 |
Nature of Suit | 896 Other Statutes - Arbitration |
Cause | 09:201 Enforcement of Convention |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 1:14 PM EDT |
Petitioner
National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsbugh, PA
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Voice Tele Services Inc.
|
Docket last updated: 46 minutes ago |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Fri 04/19 10:20 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Margaret M. Garnett from Joseph R. Profaizer dated April 19, 2024 re: confirming compliance with April 9, 2024 Order [Dkt. No. 12]. Document filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA..(Profaizer, Joseph) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Mon 04/15 11:37 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order (dated April 9, 2024), Summons in a Civili Case, Civil Cover Sheet, Memorandum of Law, Declaration of Kurt W. Hansson, Petition to Confirm and Enforce Final Arbitration Award and Rule 7.1 Statement served on Voice Tele Services, Inc. on April 10, 2024. Service was accepted by Amy Parini, Receptionist. Document filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA..(Profaizer, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/10 12:43 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Joseph R. Profaizer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Margaret M. Garnett)(Text Only Order) (kv) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/09 4:52 PM
MOTION for Joseph R. Profaizer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29196387. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA..(Profaizer, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Joseph R. Profaizer in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - DC, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Texas, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/09 12:09 PM
ORDER: On April 5, 2024, Petitioner filed a petition to confirm an arbitration award. Proceedings to confirm an arbitration award must be "treated as akin to a motion for summary judgment." D.H. Blair & Co., Inc. v. Gottdiener, 462 F.3d 95, 109 (2d Cir. 2006). Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Petitioner shall file and serve any additional materials with which they intend to support their petition to confirm by April 22, 2024. Respondent's opposition, if any, is due on May 6, 2024. Petitioner's reply, if any, is due May 13, 2024. Petitioner shall serve the petition and all supporting papers, as well as this Order, upon Respondent pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than April 22, 2024, and shall file an affidavit of such service with the Court no later than April 23, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 4/9/2024) (mml) |
|
misc
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
Tue 04/09 4:55 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 10 MOTION for Joseph R. Profaizer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29196387. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/08 11:15 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hansson, Kurt) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/08 10:20 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Voice Tele Services Inc.. (vf) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Mon 04/08 10:08 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kurt Wayne Hansson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsbugh, PA. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/08 10:12 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Kurt Wayne Hansson to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error. Form is not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 04/08 10:14 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Margaret M. Garnett. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 04/08 10:14 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 04/08 10:15 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
respoth
Declaration in Support (non-motion)
Fri 04/05 1:34 PM
DECLARATION of Kurt W. Hansson in Support re:1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsbugh, PA..(Hansson, Kurt) |
|
Att: 1 55 pgs Exhibit 1 - Final Arbitration Award, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Letter from N. Gilmartin to N. Palmer dated July 6, 2020, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Letter from R. Cummings to L. Romero dated Sept. 2, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
16
pgs
respoth
Memorandum of Law in Support (non-motion)
Fri 04/05 1:30 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration . Document filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsbugh, PA..(Hansson, Kurt) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/05 1:25 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Voice Tele Services Inc., re:1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsbugh, PA..(Hansson, Kurt) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/05 1:23 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hansson, Kurt) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/05 1:20 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty, Inc. for National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsbugh, PA. Document filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsbugh, PA..(Hansson, Kurt) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration
Fri 04/05 12:57 PM
PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29180446).Document filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsbugh, PA..(Hansson, Kurt) |