Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Julie S Sneed
Referred: Robert M Norway
Case #: 6:24-cv-00661
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
CauseAmericans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2024
Terminated:May 30, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 05, 2024 11:05 AM EDT
Defendant
Pope Shenouda and Ava Hedra LLC
Plaintiff
Howard Cohan
Represented By
Gregory Steven Sconzo
Sconzo Law Office, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 31, 2024
12 12 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 05/31 10:09 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (HAI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 05/30 3:20 PM
60-DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Any pending motions are denied as moot and the Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate all deadlines and close this case. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on May 30, 2024. (DAD)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of settlement Thu 05/30 1:54 PM
NOTICE of settlement by Howard Cohan (Sconzo, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
9 9 respoth Answer to court interrogatories Wed 04/24 8:45 AM
ANSWER to court interrogatories by Howard Cohan.(Sconzo, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Photographs,
Att: 2 Exhibit Pacer Search
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of a Related Action Tue 04/23 4:12 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Howard Cohan. Related case(s): Yes (Sconzo, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
7 7 service Summons returned executed Mon 04/22 2:34 PM
RETURN of service executed on 04/19/2024 by Howard Cohan as to Pope Shenouda and Ava Hedra LLC. (Sconzo, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
6 6 order Case Management Scheduling Order Wed 04/10 2:26 PM
ADA SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 4/10/2024. (GNB)
Related: [-]
5 5 15 pgs order Order Wed 04/10 2:20 PM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 4/10/2024. (GNB)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
4 4 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/08 1:12 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1 AND LOCAL RULE 3.03 by Howard Cohan. (Sconzo, Gregory)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons issued Mon 04/08 11:20 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Pope Shenouda and Ava Hedra LLC. (EVK)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 04/05 3:41 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Julie S. Sneed and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:24-cv-661-JSS-RMN. (AA)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/05 1:11 PM
COMPLAINT against Pope Shenouda and Ava Hedra LLC (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21951874) filed by Howard Cohan.(Sconzo, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit Settlement Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit Receipt